EP1142974 - Adhesive tape for protection and sound damping [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.06.2004 [2004/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PLASTO SA 42, rue de Longvic 21304 Chenove Cédex / FR | [2002/24] |
Former [2002/23] | For all designated states PLASTO POLYMERES ET ADHESIFS 42, rue de Longvic 21304 Chenove Cédex / FR | ||
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states PLASTO S.A. 42, rue de Longvic 21300 Chenôve / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Durand, Hervé 5, place Jacques Prévert 21000 Dijon / FR | [2001/41] | Representative(s) | Hubert, Philippe, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | Hubert, Philippe, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 01400469.1 | 22.02.2001 | [2001/41] | Priority number, date | FR20000004217 | 03.04.2000 Original published format: FR 0004217 | [2001/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1142974 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C09J7/04 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
C09J7/21 (EP,US);
C09J7/29 (EP,US);
C09J2400/263 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/27] |
Former [2001/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Schutz- und Schalldämmungsklebeband | [2001/41] | English: | Adhesive tape for protection and sound damping | [2001/41] | French: | Bande adhésive de protection et d'insonorisation | [2001/41] | Examination procedure | 19.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/22] | 01.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/25] | 16.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0716136 (BEIERSDORF AG [DE]) [DA] 1-12* claim - *; | [DA]WO9950943 (HAENSEL VERBUNDTECHNIK GMBH & [DE], et al) [DA] 1-12 * page 7, paragraph 2 * * figure 1 * * page 8, paragraph 2 * * page 9, paragraph 2 *; | [A]DE19910730 (CERTOPLAST VORWERK & SOHN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-12 * column 4, line 47 - line 64 * * figure . * * column 5, line 37 - line 50 * |