EP1127777 - Motor vehicle end module [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.2006 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPAGNIE PLASTIC OMNIUM 19, avenue Jules Carteret 69007 Lyon / FR | [2005/49] |
Former [2001/35] | For all designated states COMPAGNIE PLASTIC OMNIUM 19, avenue Jules Carteret 69007 Lyon / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Delavalle, Dominique 1111 Rue Général Andréa 01100 Marchon / FR | 02 /
Rochon, Cyrille 13C, rue des Voiturons 01100 Oyonnax / FR | [2001/35] | Representative(s) | Tanty, François Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/35] | Tanty, François Nony & Associés, 3, rue de Penthièvre 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 01400482.4 | 23.02.2001 | [2001/35] | Priority number, date | FR20000002317 | 24.02.2000 Original published format: FR 0002317 | [2001/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1127777 | Date: | 29.08.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1127777 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B62D25/08, B62D29/00, B62D31/02 | [2001/35] | CPC: |
B62D25/087 (EP,US);
B62D25/08 (EP,US);
B62D29/001 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2002/21] |
Former [2001/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Endmodul für ein Kraftfahrzeug | [2001/35] | English: | Motor vehicle end module | [2001/35] | French: | Module arrière pour véhicule automobile | [2001/35] | Examination procedure | 12.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/02] | 02.03.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.07.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 08.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.04.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2002 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/36] | IT | 07.12.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE761447 (RINGHOFFER TATRA WERKE AG) [X] 1-3 * page 2, line 14 - page 2, line 36 ** page 2, line 57 - page 2, line 75 *; | [X]EP0270097 (FIAT AUTO SPA [IT]) [X] 12,13 * column 3, line 12 - column 3, line 45; figure 1 *; | [X]WO9912798 (PIVCO AS [NO], et al) [X] 1-9,13 * figure 1; claims 1,3,6,12 * * page 6, line 31 - page 7, line 2 *; | [DX]DE19913532 (WAGON AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE]) [DX] 1-4,15,16,18,19 * figures 2,5 * * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 8 * * column 4, line 38 - column 5, line 7 * | by applicant | DE19913532 | FR2773132 |