EP1241245 - Candle with adjustable flame having wick made of paper [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.04.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.06.2004 [2004/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Miralles, Esteban Valle de Arán 3 2 Izda 04009 Piedras Redondas Almeria / ES | For all designated states Rubia, Mireia Valle de Arán 3 2 Izda 04009 Piedras redondas Almeria / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2002/38] | For all designated states Miralles, Esteban Valle de Arán 3 2 Izda 04009 Piedras Redondas, Almeria / ES | ||
For all designated states Rubia, Mireia Valle de Arán 3 2 Izda 04009 Piedras redondas, Almeria / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/38] | Application number, filing date | 01400662.1 | 14.03.2001 | [2002/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1241245 | Date: | 18.09.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C11C5/00, F23D3/16 | [2002/38] | CPC: |
C11C5/006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2003/23] |
Former [2002/38] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Kerze mit regelbarer Flamme und einem Docht aus Papier | [2002/38] | English: | Candle with adjustable flame having wick made of paper | [2002/38] | French: | Bougie à flamme réglable dont la méche est en papier | [2002/38] | Examination procedure | 19.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/24] | 03.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/24] | Public notification(s) | CONSTATATION DE PERTE D'UN DROIT CONFORMéMENT à LA RèGLE 69(1) CBE | Miralles, Esteban Valle de Arán 3 2 Izda 04009 Piedras Redondas, Almeria / ES | [2003/49] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.04.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 28.04.2003 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0075267 (REID CHRISTOPHER [GB], et al) [X] 1-5 * page 1, lines 1,17; figure - * * page 3, line 5 - page 4, line 5 * * page 5, line 21 - page 6, line 9 *; | [XY]US5395234 (GUTIERREZ JOHN P [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * column 2, line 5 - column 2, line 62; figure 3 * [Y] 3; | [Y]GB201857 (PATRICK AMBROSE CROWE) [Y] 3 * figure - *; | [A]DE2908519 (STOFF WERNER) [A] 1-5 * figure - *; | [A]GB738060 (LEIF RAMSTAD) [A] 1 * page 2, line 2 - page 2, line 12 * |