EP1155744 - Spring-type push-button [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/24] | For all designated states L'ORÉAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2001/47] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bethune, Alain 16, Rue de l'Aviation 91600 Savigny / FR | 02 /
Rousselet, Guilhem 9, Rue Mathurin Régnier 75015 Paris / FR | [2001/47] | Representative(s) | Tanty, François Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/47] | Tanty, François Nony & Associés, 3, rue de Penthièvre 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 01400718.1 | 20.03.2001 | [2001/47] | Priority number, date | FR20000004125 | 31.03.2000 Original published format: FR 0004125 | [2001/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1155744 | Date: | 21.11.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1155744 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B05B11/00, B65D83/16 | [2001/47] | CPC: |
B65D83/20 (EP,US);
B05B11/1042 (EP,US);
B05B11/1074 (EP,US);
B05B11/1077 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/32] |
Former [2001/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Federbelasteter Drücker | [2001/47] | English: | Spring-type push-button | [2001/47] | French: | Bouton-poussoir à effet ressort | [2001/47] | Examination procedure | 05.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/47] | 28.06.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 06.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/21] | Request for further processing for: | 03.07.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 03.07.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.11.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.06.2008 | CY | 11.06.2008 | DK | 11.06.2008 | FI | 11.06.2008 | IE | 11.06.2008 | NL | 11.06.2008 | TR | 11.06.2008 | SE | 11.09.2008 | GR | 12.09.2008 | PT | 11.11.2008 | [2011/43] |
Former [2010/47] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
DK | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
IE | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
GR | 12.09.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
DK | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
IE | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
DK | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/01] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
NL | 11.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 11.06.2008 | |
FI | 11.06.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]FR2668456 (DUCROS FILS SA [FR]) [X] 1 * page 6, line 31 - page 8, line 3; figures 1,7 * [A] 3; | [DXA]US5363993 (MASCITELLI FRANCESCO [IT], et al) [DX] 1,4,5,7-12,20,21 * column 3, line 5 - line 12 * * column 3, line 32 - column 4, line 7 * * column 5, line 6 - line 32; figure 1 * [A] 16,19; | [X]US5477985 (GUERET JEAN-LOUIS H [FR]) [X] 1* column 7, line 38 - line 58; figure 9 *; | [X]WO9628257 (TAPLAST SRL [IT], et al) [X] 1,4,5,7,8,11,12,14,17 * page 5, line 15 - page 6, line 11; figure 1 *; | [XA]FR2735452 (CHOPIN MICHEL [FR]) [X] 1,2,4-6,10,11,16 * page 3, line 18 - page 4, line 4 * * page 4, line 21 - page 5, line 1; figures 1-4 * [A] 19; | [XA]EP0863089 (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1,2,4-8,10 * column 6, line 4 - column 7, line 9; figures 1-3 * [A] 19; | [X]DE19729516 (WIEGNER GEORG [HK]) [X] 1-9,11,16 * column 4, line 39 - column 5, line 34 * * column 5, line 68 - column 6, line 14; figures 1-4 * | by applicant | US5363993 | FR2735452 |