EP1246467 - Method for establishing a connection between an interactive network adapter and a network interface unit as well as network interface unit and interactive network adapter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.01.2004 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.03.2004 [2004/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON multimedia S.A. 46, quai A. Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | [2002/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Berguiere, Guillaume 1 rue du Portail 35135 Chantepie / FR | 02 /
Adam, Franck 6 Place du Général Koenig 35000 Rennes / FR | [2002/40] | Representative(s) | Schäferjohann, Volker, et al Deutsche Thomson OHG Karl-Wiechert-Allee 1D 30625 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/40] | Schäferjohann, Volker Willi, Dipl.-Phys., et al Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 01400754.6 | 23.03.2001 | [2002/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1246467 | Date: | 02.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/173 | [2002/40] | CPC: |
H04N21/2385 (EP);
H04N21/6118 (EP);
H04N21/6168 (EP);
H04N7/17309 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2003/26] |
Former [2002/40] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Einrichtung einer Verbindung zwischen einem interaktiven Netzadapter und einem Netzwerkschnittstellengerät sowie Netzwerkschnittstellengerät und interaktiver Netzadapter | [2002/40] | English: | Method for establishing a connection between an interactive network adapter and a network interface unit as well as network interface unit and interactive network adapter | [2002/40] | French: | Procédé pour l'établissement d'une connection entre un adaptateur de réseau interactif et une unité d'interface de réseau ainsi que unité d'interface de rèseau et adaptateur de réseau interactif | [2002/40] | Examination procedure | 03.04.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/12] | 02.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/12] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.06.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.06.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 11.06.2003 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US5606725 (HART GAYLORD A [US]) [Y] 1 * column 3, line 18 - line 50 * [A] 2-15; | [YA]US6167095 (FURUKAWA NEIL E [US], et al) [Y] 1 * column 3, line 52 - column 6, line 45 * [A] 2-15; | [A]US5926476 (GHAIBEH GIHAD [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |