EP1182550 - Task based priority arbitration [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.05.2008 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEXAS INSTRUMENTS FRANCE Avenue Bel Air, BP 5 06271 Villeneuve Loubet Cedex Nice / FR | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated 7839 Churchill Way Mail Station 3999 Dallas, Texas 75251 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/09] | For all designated states Texas Instruments France Avenue Bel Air BP5 06271 Villeneuve Loubet Cedex, Nice / FR | ||
For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated 7839 Churchill Way, Mail Station 3999 Dallas, Texas 75251 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chauvel, Gérard Res. du Valbosquet 20, 292 Chemin du Valbosquet 06600 Antibes Antibes / FR | 02 /
Lasserre, Serge 278 rue du Marsaou Frejus 83600 Lieudit St. Jean de Cannes / FR | [2002/09] | Representative(s) | Holt, Michael, et al Texas Instruments Limited European Patent Department 3rd Floor 401 Grafton Gate Milton Keynes MK9 1AQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Holt, Michael, et al Texas Instruments Limited European Patents Department 800 Pavilion Drive Northampton NN4 7YL / GB | ||
Former [2003/35] | Holt, Michael, et al Texas Instruments Limited European Patents Department PO Box 5069 Northampton, NN4 7ZE / GB | ||
Former [2002/09] | Holt, Michael Texas Instruments Ltd., EPD MS/13, 800 Pavilion Drive Northampton Business Park, Northampton NN4 7YL / GB | Application number, filing date | 01400819.7 | 30.03.2001 | [2002/09] | Priority number, date | EP20000402331 | 21.08.2000 Original published format: EP 00402331 | [2002/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1182550 | Date: | 27.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1182550 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | [2006/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/08, G06F9/46 | [2006/35] | CPC: |
G06F12/1027 (EP,US);
G06F1/206 (EP,US);
G06F1/3203 (EP,US);
G06F1/329 (EP,US);
G06F12/0891 (EP,US);
G06F9/30043 (EP,US);
G06F12/1081 (EP,US);
G06F2201/81 (EP,US);
G06F2201/885 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2002/09] | G06F9/46 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/09] | Title | German: | Aufgabenbasierte Prioritätsarbitrierung | [2002/09] | English: | Task based priority arbitration | [2002/09] | French: | Arbitrage de priorité orienté tâches | [2002/09] | Examination procedure | 26.04.2001 | Examination requested [2002/09] | 09.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/23] | 10.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   10.07.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5339443 (LOCKWOOD JAMES M [US]) [Y] 1-16 * abstract * * column 2, line 17 - column 3, line 31 * * column 4, line 11 - column 8, line 54; figures 2,6; claims 1-20 *; | [Y]JPH06131201 ; | [A]US5884051 (SCHAFFER MARK MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * column 3, line 5 - line 64 * * column 4, line 46 - column 13, line 57; claims 1-21 *; | [A]US5805905 (BISWAS SUKALPA [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 36 * * column 3, line 55 - column 16, line 46; claims 1-69 *; | [A]JPH10171666 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940809), vol. 018, no. 426, Database accession no. (P - 1784), & JP06131201 A 19940513 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 1-16 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980930), vol. 1998, no. 11, & JP10171666 A 19980626 (NEC CORP) [A] 1-16 * abstract * |