EP1152198 - Cooling line apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'air Liquide, S.A. à Directoire et Conseil de Surveillance pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/13] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, S.A. à Directoire et Conseil de Surveillance pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2001/45] | For all designated states Carboxyque Française 5, place de la Pyramide, Tour Ariane 92088 La Défense / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Buil, José 55bis, boulevard Jean Jaurès 94260 Fresnes / FR | 02 /
Flamant, Hervé Le Groupe Scolaire Savigny 93600 Aulnay-Sous-Bois / FR | 03 /
Servel, Séverine 47 avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | [2001/46] |
Former [2001/45] | 01 /
Buil, José 55bis, boulevard Jean Jaurès 94260 Fresnes / FR | ||
02 /
Flamant, Hervé 3, rue Saint Just 93150 Le Blanc Mesnil / FR | |||
03 /
Servel, Séverine 47 avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | Representative(s) | Mellul-Bendelac, Sylvie Lisette, et al L'Air Liquide Direction des Services De la Propriété Intellectuelle 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/45] | Mellul-Bendelac, Sylvie Lisette, et al L'Air Liquide, Service Propriété Industrielle, 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 01400867.6 | 04.04.2001 | [2001/45] | Priority number, date | FR20000005645 | 03.05.2000 Original published format: FR 0005645 | [2001/45] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1152198 | Date: | 07.11.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1152198 | Date: | 10.11.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F25D3/12, F25D29/00 | [2001/45] | CPC: |
F17C7/00 (EP);
F17C7/02 (EP);
F25D29/001 (EP);
F25D3/127 (EP);
F17C2205/0323 (EP);
F17C2205/0326 (EP);
F17C2221/013 (EP);
F17C2223/0123 (EP);
F17C2250/06 (EP);
F17C2265/015 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/30] |
Former [2001/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Kühlstrecke | [2001/45] | English: | Cooling line apparatus | [2001/45] | French: | Dispositif de refroidissement en ligne | [2001/45] | Examination procedure | 07.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/28] | 08.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.11.2004 | FI | 10.11.2004 | IE | 10.11.2004 | NL | 10.11.2004 | TR | 10.11.2004 | DK | 10.02.2005 | GR | 10.02.2005 | SE | 10.02.2005 | CY | 04.04.2005 | LU | 04.04.2005 | PT | 10.04.2005 | BE | 30.04.2005 | CH | 30.04.2005 | LI | 30.04.2005 | MC | 30.04.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/27] | AT | 10.11.2004 | |
FI | 10.11.2004 | ||
IE | 10.11.2004 | ||
NL | 10.11.2004 | ||
TR | 10.11.2004 | ||
DK | 10.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
SE | 10.02.2005 | ||
CY | 04.04.2005 | ||
LU | 04.04.2005 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
CH | 30.04.2005 | ||
LI | 30.04.2005 | ||
MC | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 10.11.2004 | |
FI | 10.11.2004 | ||
IE | 10.11.2004 | ||
NL | 10.11.2004 | ||
TR | 10.11.2004 | ||
DK | 10.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
SE | 10.02.2005 | ||
CY | 04.04.2005 | ||
LU | 04.04.2005 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
CH | 30.04.2005 | ||
LI | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 10.11.2004 | |
FI | 10.11.2004 | ||
IE | 10.11.2004 | ||
NL | 10.11.2004 | ||
TR | 10.11.2004 | ||
DK | 10.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
SE | 10.02.2005 | ||
CY | 04.04.2005 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
CH | 30.04.2005 | ||
LI | 30.04.2005 | ||
LU | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/09] | AT | 10.11.2004 | |
FI | 10.11.2004 | ||
IE | 10.11.2004 | ||
NL | 10.11.2004 | ||
TR | 10.11.2004 | ||
DK | 10.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
SE | 10.02.2005 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
CH | 30.04.2005 | ||
LI | 30.04.2005 | ||
LU | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 10.11.2004 | |
FI | 10.11.2004 | ||
IE | 10.11.2004 | ||
NL | 10.11.2004 | ||
TR | 10.11.2004 | ||
DK | 10.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
CH | 30.04.2005 | ||
LI | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 10.11.2004 | |
FI | 10.11.2004 | ||
IE | 10.11.2004 | ||
NL | 10.11.2004 | ||
DK | 10.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
BE | 30.04.2005 | ||
CH | 30.04.2005 | ||
LI | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 10.11.2004 | |
FI | 10.11.2004 | ||
IE | 10.11.2004 | ||
NL | 10.11.2004 | ||
DK | 10.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
CH | 30.04.2005 | ||
LI | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 10.11.2004 | |
FI | 10.11.2004 | ||
IE | 10.11.2004 | ||
DK | 10.02.2005 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 10.11.2004 | |
FI | 10.11.2004 | ||
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | FI | 10.11.2004 | |
GR | 10.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 10.11.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3014705 (EDWARD COLUCCI STEVE) [A] 1 * figure 1 ** column 1, line 64 - column 3, line 14 *; | [XY]EP0872563 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]) [X] 1,2,5 * abstract * * column 7, line 57 - column 8, line 5 * * column 9, line 31 - column 12, line 53 * [Y] 12,13; | [DYA]FR2762190 (CARBOXYQUE FRANCAISE [FR]) [DY] 12,13 * abstract * * page 5, line 24 - page 11, line 8 * [A] 1,5,10,11 |