EP1153843 - Apparatus for delivering a composition with a concentration gradient [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.2004 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 28.02.2007 [2007/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/46] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
De Laforcade, Vincent 3, Allée des Bleuets 78120 Rambouillet / FR | [2001/46] | Representative(s) | Boulard, Denis L'Oréal Service DIPI 9 Rue Pierre Dreyfus 92110 Clichy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/46] | Boulard, Denis L'OREAL-DPI 6 rue Bertrand Sincholle 92585 Clichy Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 01400909.6 | 09.04.2001 | [2001/46] | Priority number, date | FR20000005951 | 10.05.2000 Original published format: FR 0005951 | [2001/46] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1153843 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1153843 | Date: | 30.07.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B65D47/20, B65D47/34, B05B11/00, B01F3/08 | [2001/46] | CPC: |
B05B11/0037 (EP,US);
B01F23/45 (EP,US);
B05B11/0044 (EP,US);
B05B11/0078 (EP,US);
B05B11/1081 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/31] |
Former [2001/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Ausgeben eines Produkts mit Konzentrationsgradienten | [2001/46] | English: | Apparatus for delivering a composition with a concentration gradient | [2001/46] | French: | Dispositif de distribution d'une composition à gradient de concentration | [2001/46] | Examination procedure | 14.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/18] | 26.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.07.2003 | CY | 30.07.2003 | FI | 30.07.2003 | IE | 30.07.2003 | NL | 30.07.2003 | TR | 30.07.2003 | DK | 30.10.2003 | GR | 30.10.2003 | SE | 30.10.2003 | PT | 30.12.2003 | LU | 09.04.2004 | BE | 30.04.2004 | MC | 30.04.2004 | [2007/09] |
Former [2006/51] | AT | 30.07.2003 | |
FI | 30.07.2003 | ||
IE | 30.07.2003 | ||
NL | 30.07.2003 | ||
TR | 30.07.2003 | ||
DK | 30.10.2003 | ||
GR | 30.10.2003 | ||
SE | 30.10.2003 | ||
PT | 30.12.2003 | ||
LU | 09.04.2004 | ||
BE | 30.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/28] | AT | 30.07.2003 | |
FI | 30.07.2003 | ||
IE | 30.07.2003 | ||
NL | 30.07.2003 | ||
DK | 30.10.2003 | ||
GR | 30.10.2003 | ||
SE | 30.10.2003 | ||
PT | 30.12.2003 | ||
LU | 09.04.2004 | ||
BE | 30.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 30.07.2003 | |
FI | 30.07.2003 | ||
IE | 30.07.2003 | ||
NL | 30.07.2003 | ||
DK | 30.10.2003 | ||
GR | 30.10.2003 | ||
SE | 30.10.2003 | ||
PT | 30.12.2003 | ||
LU | 09.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 30.07.2003 | |
FI | 30.07.2003 | ||
IE | 30.07.2003 | ||
NL | 30.07.2003 | ||
DK | 30.10.2003 | ||
GR | 30.10.2003 | ||
SE | 30.10.2003 | ||
PT | 30.12.2003 | ||
MC | 30.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 30.07.2003 | |
FI | 30.07.2003 | ||
IE | 30.07.2003 | ||
NL | 30.07.2003 | ||
DK | 30.10.2003 | ||
GR | 30.10.2003 | ||
SE | 30.10.2003 | ||
PT | 30.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/29] | AT | 30.07.2003 | |
FI | 30.07.2003 | ||
IE | 30.07.2003 | ||
NL | 30.07.2003 | ||
DK | 30.10.2003 | ||
GR | 30.10.2003 | ||
SE | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/16] | AT | 30.07.2003 | |
FI | 30.07.2003 | ||
NL | 30.07.2003 | ||
GR | 30.10.2003 | ||
SE | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | AT | 30.07.2003 | |
FI | 30.07.2003 | ||
NL | 30.07.2003 | ||
GR | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | FI | 30.07.2003 | |
NL | 30.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/12] | FI | 30.07.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1152106 (PROCTOR RUDY ROY [US], et al) [A] 1* page 4, line 19 - line 41; figure - *; | [A]US5009342 (LAWRENCE RONALD L [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, lines 30-64 * * column 7, lines 7-17 * * figures 1,5,7-9 *; | [A]US5848732 (BRUGGER GERHARD [DE]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 39 - column 2, line 5 * * figure 1 * |