EP1156645 - Assembly of a cellular telephone and a motor vehicle. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/47] | Assembly of a cellular telephone and a motor vehicle. Cellular telephone and motor vehicle for this assembly | ||
[2007/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAGEM Communication Le Ponant de Paris 27, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [2006/23] |
Former [2001/47] | For all designated states SAGEM SA 6, Avenue d'Iéna 75116 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Staebler, Patrick 7, avenue La Fontaine aux Dames 78450 Villepreux / FR | [2001/47] | Representative(s) | Bloch, Gérard Gevers France 41, Avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/47] | Bloch, Gérard 2, square de l'Avenue du Bois 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 01401169.6 | 07.05.2001 | [2001/47] | Priority number, date | FR20000006209 | 16.05.2000 Original published format: FR 0006209 | [2001/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1156645 | Date: | 21.11.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1156645 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/60, H04B1/38 | [2001/47] | CPC: |
H04M1/6091 (EP);
H04B1/3877 (EP);
H04M2250/02 (EP);
H04M2250/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [2002/32] |
Former [2001/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Anordnung von einem zellularem Telefon und einem Kraftfahrzeug. | [2007/17] | English: | Assembly of a cellular telephone and a motor vehicle. | [2007/17] | French: | Ensemble d'un téléphone cellulaire et d'un véhicule automobile. | [2007/17] |
Former [2001/47] | Anordnung von einem zellularem Telefon und einem Kraftfahrzeug. Zellulares telefon und Kraftfahrzeug für die genannte Anordnung | ||
Former [2001/47] | Assembly of a cellular telephone and a motor vehicle. Cellular telephone and motor vehicle for this assembly | ||
Former [2001/47] | Ensemble d'un téléphone cellulaire et d'un véhicule automobile. Téléphone cellulaire et véhicule automobile pour cet ensemble | Examination procedure | 13.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/29] | 22.05.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.09.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, FR, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 29.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.06.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.06.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.06.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 25.06.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 25.06.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 25.06.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 25.06.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 25.06.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 25.06.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.06.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 25.06.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 25.06.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 25.06.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.06.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.06.2002 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO9857824 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 8 * page 2, line 15 - page 3, line 24 * * page 4, line 16 - page 5, line 3 * * page 5, line 28 - page 6, line 18 * * figure 1 * [A] 1,3-5,7,9,12; | [XA]GB2264613 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]) [X] 8 * page 2, line 4 - page 4, line 11 * * page 5, line 7 - page 6, line 5 * * page 7, line 9 - page 8, line 13 * * page 10, line 9 - page 12, line 26 * * page 13, line 16 - line 24 * * page 13, line 25 - page 16, line 6 * * page 22, line 2 - page 24, line 24 * * figures 1,2,4,5,9 * [A] 1,2,6,7,9,12; | [XA]WO9966647 (HONEYWILL ALBERT WILLIAM [US]) [X] 8 * abstract * * page 4, line 17 - line 22 * * page 5, line 16 - page 7, line 24 * * page 8, line 19 - line 23 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 1,3,6,7; | [XA]WO9727697 (OKI TELECOM [US], et al) [X] 8 * abstract * * page 2, line 5 - page 3, line 5 * * page 5, line 8 - page 6, line 6 * * page 6, line 13 - page 8, line 6 * * page 9, line 16 - page 10, line 12 * * figures 2-4 * [A] 1,6,7; | [PX]EP1049347 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [PX] 8,9,12 * abstract * * column 1, line 5 - line 15 * * column 2, line 7 - line 21 * * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 3 * * column 3, line 35 - column 4, line 4 * * column 4, line 15 - line 30 * * figure 5 *; | [A]US6026162 (PALETT ANTHONY P [US], et al) [A] 1,6-8 * column 2, line 3 - line 35 * * column 4, line 13 - column 5, line 39 * * column 6, line 13 - column 7, line 10 * * figures 3-5,26 * |