EP1156017 - Transfer wheel for method and apparatus for making thermoplastic articles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2006 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAINT-GOBAIN EMBALLAGE Les Miroirs (Défense 3), 18, avenue d'Alsace 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2001/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gallo, Enrico 5, Rue du Roi Gontran 71100 Chalon sur Saone / FR | 02 /
Mainet, Gerard 31, rue du Regiment d'infanterie 71100 Chalon sur Saone / FR | [2001/47] | Representative(s) | Muller, René, et al SAINT-GOBAIN RECHERCHE 39, quai Lucien Lefranc 93303 Aubervilliers / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Muller, René, et al SAINT-GOBAIN RECHERCHE 39, quai Lucien Lefranc 93303 Aubervilliers / FR | ||
Former [2001/47] | Muller, René, et al SAINT-GOBAIN RECHERCHE 39, quai Lucien Lefranc 93300 Aubervilliers / FR | Application number, filing date | 01401263.7 | 16.05.2001 | [2001/47] | Priority number, date | FR20000006400 | 18.05.2000 Original published format: FR 0006400 | [2001/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1156017 | Date: | 21.11.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1156017 | Date: | 23.03.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C03B35/08 | [2001/47] | CPC: |
C03B35/085 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/32] |
Former [2001/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Transfertrad zum Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von Gegenständen aus thermoplastischen Materialen | [2001/47] | English: | Transfer wheel for method and apparatus for making thermoplastic articles | [2001/47] | French: | Roue de transfert pour procédé et dispositif de fabrication d'articles en matière thermoplastique | [2001/47] | Examination procedure | 05.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/32] | 07.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 05.06.2002 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   05.06.2002 | 05.06.2002 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   05.06.2002 | 05.06.2002 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   05.06.2002 | 05.06.2002 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   05.06.2002 | 05.06.2002 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   05.06.2002 | 05.06.2002 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   05.06.2002 | 05.06.2002 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   05.06.2002 | 05.06.2002 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   05.06.2002 | 05.06.2002 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   05.06.2002 | 05.06.2002 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   05.06.2002 | 05.06.2002 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   05.06.2002 | 05.06.2002 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   05.06.2002 | 05.06.2002 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   05.06.2002 | 05.06.2002 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   05.06.2002 | 05.06.2002 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   05.06.2002 | 05.06.2002 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   05.06.2002 | 05.06.2002 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   05.06.2002 | 05.06.2002 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   05.06.2002 | 05.06.2002 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   05.06.2002 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 05.06.2002 | M01   Fee paid on   05.06.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.03.2005 | FI | 23.03.2005 | IE | 23.03.2005 | TR | 23.03.2005 | CY | 16.05.2005 | LU | 16.05.2005 | CH | 31.05.2005 | LI | 31.05.2005 | MC | 31.05.2005 | DK | 23.06.2005 | GR | 23.06.2005 | SE | 23.06.2005 | [2008/07] |
Former [2007/27] | AT | 23.03.2005 | |
FI | 23.03.2005 | ||
IE | 23.03.2005 | ||
TR | 23.03.2005 | ||
CY | 16.05.2005 | ||
LU | 16.05.2005 | ||
CH | 31.05.2005 | ||
LI | 31.05.2005 | ||
MC | 31.05.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 23.03.2005 | |
FI | 23.03.2005 | ||
IE | 23.03.2005 | ||
TR | 23.03.2005 | ||
CY | 16.05.2005 | ||
LU | 16.05.2005 | ||
CH | 31.05.2005 | ||
LI | 31.05.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 23.03.2005 | |
FI | 23.03.2005 | ||
IE | 23.03.2005 | ||
TR | 23.03.2005 | ||
CY | 16.05.2005 | ||
CH | 31.05.2005 | ||
LI | 31.05.2005 | ||
LU | 31.05.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
Former [2007/09] | AT | 23.03.2005 | |
FI | 23.03.2005 | ||
IE | 23.03.2005 | ||
TR | 23.03.2005 | ||
CH | 31.05.2005 | ||
LI | 31.05.2005 | ||
LU | 31.05.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 23.03.2005 | |
FI | 23.03.2005 | ||
IE | 23.03.2005 | ||
TR | 23.03.2005 | ||
CH | 31.05.2005 | ||
LI | 31.05.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 23.03.2005 | |
FI | 23.03.2005 | ||
IE | 23.03.2005 | ||
CH | 31.05.2005 | ||
LI | 31.05.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
GR | 23.06.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 23.03.2005 | |
FI | 23.03.2005 | ||
IE | 23.03.2005 | ||
DK | 23.06.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 23.03.2005 | |
FI | 23.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 23.03.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2002150 (EMHART CORP) [A] 1-6* the whole document *; | [A]US4411353 (MCDOLE LAWRENCE K [US]) [A] 1-6 * column W * |