EP1158829 - Method for reconnection of a radiocommunication terminal to a network and corresponding terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.05.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3, avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/08] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3 avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2011/29] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2007/14] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2001/48] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Attimont, Luc 11 bis, rue des Monts Grevets, Escalier A3 78100 Saint Germain en Laye / FR | 02 /
Bodin, Jannick 162, Grande Rue 92380 Garches / FR | [2001/48] | Representative(s) | Nicolle, Olivier, et al Alcatel-Lucent International 32, avenue Kléber 92700 Colombes / FR | [2012/10] |
Former [2007/25] | Korakis-Ménager, Sophie, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2001/48] | Lamoureux, Bernard, et al COMPAGNIE FINANCIERE ALCATEL Dépt. Propriété industrielle 30, avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 01401328.8 | 21.05.2001 | [2001/48] | Priority number, date | FR20000006687 | 25.05.2000 Original published format: FR 0006687 | [2001/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1158829 | Date: | 28.11.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1158829 | Date: | 20.07.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/30 | [2011/07] | CPC: |
H04W72/02 (EP,US);
H04W36/302 (EP,US);
H04W36/305 (EP,US);
H04W48/16 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/48] | H04Q7/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/48] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Wiederverbindung eines Funkkommunikationsendgeräts mit einem Netzwerk und entsprechendes Endgerät | [2011/07] | English: | Method for reconnection of a radiocommunication terminal to a network and corresponding terminal | [2001/48] | French: | Procédé de re-connexion à un réseau d'un terminal de radiocommunication et terminal correspondant | [2001/48] |
Former [2001/48] | Verfahren zur Wiederverbindung eines Funkkommunikationsterminals mit einem Netzwerk und entsprechendes Endgerät | Examination procedure | 28.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/31] | 07.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.04.2006 | Opposition(s) | 23.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.07.2011 | CY | 20.07.2011 | DK | 20.07.2011 | FI | 20.07.2011 | IE | 20.07.2011 | SE | 20.07.2011 | TR | 20.07.2011 | GR | 21.10.2011 | PT | 21.11.2011 | [2014/21] |
Former [2012/31] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
DK | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
IE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
IE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | FI | 20.07.2011 | |
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 20.07.2011 | |
PT | 21.11.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5701585 (KALLIN HARALD [SE], et al); | [X]EP0840532 (MOTOROLA ISRAEL LTD [IL]) |