EP1167945 - Transport device for analysing hydrocarbon constituents [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.2007 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut Français du Pétrole 1 & 4 avenue de Bois Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | [2006/40] |
Former [2002/01] | For all designated states INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE 1 & 4 avenue Bois Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Duriez, Gilbert 13 rue du Général Carrey de Bellemare 92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | 02 /
Dewimille, Bernard 40 bis rue Remoiville 91100 Corbeil Essone / FR | [2002/01] | Application number, filing date | 01401423.7 | 31.05.2001 | [2002/01] | Priority number, date | FR20000008445 | 28.06.2000 Original published format: FR 0008445 | [2002/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1167945 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1167945 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/22, // G01N33/24 | [2002/01] | CPC: |
G01N33/2823 (EP,US);
G01N1/2214 (EP,US);
G01N1/40 (EP,US);
G01N1/405 (EP,US);
Y10T436/21 (EP,US);
Y10T436/25375 (EP,US);
Y10T436/2575 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [2002/38] |
Former [2002/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Transportgerät zur Analyse von Kohlenwasserstoffkonstituenten | [2002/01] | English: | Transport device for analysing hydrocarbon constituents | [2002/01] | French: | Dispositif de transport pour analyser des constituants hydrocarbones | [2002/01] | Examination procedure | 02.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/36] | 06.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2006 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.04.2006 | 27.03.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 06.04.2006 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 11.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2008/04] |
Former [2007/36] | IT | 04.10.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1569984 (AKAD WISSENSCHAFTEN DDR) [X] 1 * page 1, line 11 - page 1, line 76 * * page 2, line 59 - page 2, line 77 * * page 3, line 110 - page 4, line 49 * * page 4, line 108 - page 4, line 117 * * page 5, line 32 - page 6, line 20 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US3615235 (HRDINA JIRI) [A] 5 * column 1, line 16 - column 1, line 53 * * column 2, line 27 - column 2, line 41 * * column 3, line 21 - column 3, line 36 * * column 5, line 12 - column 5, line 30 * * column 6, line 54 - column 7, line 9 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US6050150 (UNDERHILL DWIGHT W [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 11 - column 1, line 18 * * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 6 * * column 2, line 61 - column 3, line 9 * * column 3, line 26 - column 3, line 29 * * column 6, line 12 - column 6, line 30 *; | [A]GB2260812 (REDDING ROBERT JAMES [GB]) [A] 1 * page 1, line 3 - page 1, line 13 * * page 2, line 1 - page 2, line 22 * * page 3, line 12 - page 3, line 27 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US5691809 (TACKETT JAMES E [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 36 - column 2, line 63 * * column 6, line 66 - column 7, line 6 * * column 7, line 21 - column 7, line 26 * * column 7, line 40 - column 7, line 62 * * column 8, line 10 - column 8, line 61 * * column 9, line 66 - column 10, line 7 * * figures 1,2 * | Examination | EP1150112 | US5566720 | US5090256 | US5954862 |