EP1164585 - Changer for disk-shaped recording media [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.09.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 31.08.2011 [2011/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/07] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2009/46] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 46, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2005/40] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 46, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2001/51] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing S.A. 46, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Woo, Jisung Flat E, 8F Orchid Court, Newtown Plaza III Shatin, N.T. / HK | [2001/51] | Representative(s) | Kurth, Dieter, et al Deutsche Thomson OHG Karl-Wiechert-Allee 1D 30625 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/51] | Kurth, Dieter, Dipl.-Ing., et al Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH, European Patent Operations, Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 01401479.9 | 06.06.2001 | [2001/51] | Priority number, date | EP20000112771 | 16.06.2000 Original published format: EP 00112771 | [2001/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1164585 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1164585 | Date: | 08.01.2003 | [2003/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1164585 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G11B17/22, G11B17/30, G11B17/04 | [2003/02] | CPC: |
G11B17/22 (EP);
G11B17/30 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/51] | G11B17/22, G11B17/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2003/39] |
Former [2001/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Wechsler für plattenförmiges Aufzeichnungsmedium | [2001/51] | English: | Changer for disk-shaped recording media | [2001/51] | French: | Changeur pour support d' enregistrement en forme de disque | [2001/51] | Examination procedure | 24.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/35] | 09.07.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.10.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 16.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.08.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.08.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.08.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 12.08.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 12.08.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.08.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 12.08.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.08.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.08.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.08.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.08.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 12.08.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 12.08.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.08.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.08.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 11.11.2009 | GB | 06.06.2010 | FR | 30.06.2010 | [2011/35] |
Former [2011/31] | IT | 11.11.2009 | |
FR | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | IT | 11.11.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH0668583 ; | [A]EP0845778 (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN [JP]) [A] 1-10 * column 4, line 45 - column 8, line 52; figures 1-3,4A-4C *; | [A]JPS63200354 ; | [A]JPH0676452 ; | [A]EP0905686 (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN [JP]) [A] 1-10 * The whole document * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940615), vol. 018, no. 315, Database accession no. (P - 1755), & JP06068583 A 19940311 (SONY CORP) [X] 1,8-10 * abstract * [A] 2-7 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881220), vol. 012, no. 488, Database accession no. (P - 803), & JP63200354 A 19880818 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940622), vol. 018, no. 330, Database accession no. (P - 1758), & JP06076452 A 19940318 (SONY CORP) [A] 1-10 * abstract * | Examination | US5781523 |