EP1182567 - Software controlled cache configuration [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEXAS INSTRUMENTS FRANCE 821, avenue Jack Kilby, B.P. 5 06271 Villeneuve Loubet Cédex / FR | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated 7839 Churchill Way Mail Station 3999 Dallas, Texas 75251 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2012/10] | For all designated states TEXAS INSTRUMENTS FRANCE 821, avenue Jack Kilby, B.P. 5 06271 Villeneuve Loubet Cédex / FR | ||
For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated 7839 Churchill Way Mail Station 3999 Dallas, Texas 75251 / US | |||
Former [2002/09] | For all designated states TEXAS INSTRUMENTS FRANCE 821, avenue Jack Kilby, B.P. 5 06271 Villeneuve Loubet Cédex / FR | ||
For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated 7839 Churchill Way, Mail Station 3999 Dallas, Texas 75251 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chauvel, Gérard Rs.Valbosquet Villa 20 292, chemin du Valbosquet Antibes 06600 / FR | 02 /
D'Inverno, Dominique 47, Ch. Basses Ginestiere Res. Le Libaret Bt B Villeneuve Loubet 06270 / FR | 03 /
Lasserre, Serge 278, rue du Marsaou Saint Jeans de Cannes Frejus 83600 / FR | [2012/10] |
Former [2002/09] | 01 /
Chauvel, Gérard Rs.Valbosquet, Villa 20, 292, chemin du Valbosquet Antibes 06600 / FR | ||
02 /
D'Inverno, Dominique 47, Ch. Basses Ginestiere, Res. Le Libaret Bt B Villeneuve Loubet 06270 / FR | |||
03 /
Lasserre, Serge 278, rue du Marsaou, Saint Jeans de Cannes Frejus 83600 / FR | Representative(s) | Holt, Michael Texas Instruments Limited European Patent Department 3rd Floor 401 Grafton Gate Milton Keynes MK9 1AQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/10] | Holt, Michael Texas Instruments Limited European Patents Department 800 Pavilion Drive Northampton NN4 7YL / GB | ||
Former [2002/09] | Holt, Michael Texas Instruments Ltd., EPD MS/13, 800 Pavilion Drive Northampton Business Park, Northampton NN4 7YL / GB | Application number, filing date | 01401532.5 | 13.06.2001 | [2002/09] | Priority number, date | EP20000402331 | 21.08.2000 Original published format: EP 00402331 | EP20000403538 | 15.12.2000 Original published format: EP 00403538 | [2002/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1182567 | Date: | 27.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1182567 | Date: | 07.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/08, G06F11/34 | [2002/09] | CPC: |
G06F12/1027 (EP,US);
G06F1/206 (EP,US);
G06F1/3203 (EP,US);
G06F1/329 (EP,US);
G06F11/3409 (EP,US);
G06F12/0802 (EP,US);
G06F12/0842 (EP,US);
G06F12/0879 (EP,US);
G06F12/0891 (EP,US);
G06F9/30047 (EP,US);
G06F2201/81 (EP,US);
G06F2201/88 (EP,US);
G06F2201/885 (EP,US);
G06F2212/1028 (EP,US);
G06F2212/601 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/09] | Title | German: | Softwaregesteuerte Cache-Speicherkonfiguration | [2002/09] | English: | Software controlled cache configuration | [2002/09] | French: | Configuration d'antémémoire commandée par logiciel | [2002/09] | Examination procedure | 27.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/44] | 23.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.06.2008 | Opposition(s) | 10.12.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/07] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 23.02.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 23.02.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.03.2009 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.03.2012 | BE | 07.03.2012 | CY | 07.03.2012 | DK | 07.03.2012 | FI | 07.03.2012 | IT | 07.03.2012 | SE | 07.03.2012 | TR | 07.03.2012 | GR | 08.06.2012 | LU | 13.06.2012 | ES | 18.06.2012 | CH | 30.06.2012 | LI | 30.06.2012 | MC | 30.06.2012 | PT | 09.07.2012 | [2014/27] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 07.03.2012 | |
BE | 07.03.2012 | ||
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
IT | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
TR | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
ES | 18.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 07.03.2012 | |
BE | 07.03.2012 | ||
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
IT | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
ES | 18.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 07.03.2012 | |
BE | 07.03.2012 | ||
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
IT | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 07.03.2012 | |
BE | 07.03.2012 | ||
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
IT | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 07.03.2012 | |
BE | 07.03.2012 | ||
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 07.03.2012 | |
BE | 07.03.2012 | ||
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | BE | 07.03.2012 | |
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 07.03.2012 | |
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/46] | BE | 07.03.2012 | |
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 07.03.2012 | |
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | GR | 08.06.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5761715 (TAKAHASHI MASAFUMI [JP]) [X] 11 * column 6, line 59 - column 9, line 36; figures 2,3 * [A] 1; | [A] - "SCHEME FOR PRODUCING MISS-RATE AS A FUNCTION OF CACHE SIZE BY MEANS OF TRACES PRODUCED BY OBSERVING MISSES FROM A CACHE OF FIXED SIZE", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, IBM CORP. NEW YORK, US, (19910401), vol. 33, no. 11, ISSN 0018-8689, pages 36 - 39, XP000110292 [A] 1,11 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5761715 |