EP1199534 - Laminated type heat exchanger [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.02.2006 [2006/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8315 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/17] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8315 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Katsuhiro, Saito, c/o Mitsubishi Heavy Ind. Ltd. 1, Asahi-cho 3-chome, Nishi-biwajima-machi Nishi-Kasugai-gun, Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Masashi, Inoue, c/o Mitsubishi Heavy Ind. Ltd. 1, Asahi-cho 3-chome, Nishi-biwajima-machi Nishi-Kasugai-gun, Aichi-ken / JP | 03 /
Yoshinori, Watanabe, c/o Mitsubishi Heavy Ind. Ltd 1, Aza Takamichi, Iwatsuka-cho, Nakamura-ku Nagoya, Aichi-ken / JP | 04 /
Akira, Yoshikoshi, c/o Mitsubishi Heavy Ind. Ltd. 1, Aza Takamichi, Iwatsuka-cho, Nakamura-ku Nagoya, Aichi-ken / JP | [2002/17] | Representative(s) | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158 rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/17] | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie, 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 01401640.6 | 21.06.2001 | [2002/17] | Priority number, date | JP20000321664 | 20.10.2000 Original published format: JP 2000321664 | [2002/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1199534 | Date: | 24.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1199534 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F28D1/03, F28F27/02 | [2002/17] | CPC: |
F28F9/0273 (EP,US);
F28D1/0341 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2003/03] |
Former [2002/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Plattenwärmetauscher | [2002/17] | English: | Laminated type heat exchanger | [2002/17] | French: | Echangeur de chaleur à plaques | [2002/17] | Examination procedure | 06.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/32] | 25.10.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.02.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 11.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.11.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.11.2002 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH06159983 ; | [X]JPS62268988 ; | [X]JPH01181090 ; | [A]JPH10267462 ; | [A]GB962753 (OSKAR WALTER) [A] 1-3 * page 1, line 70 - page 2, line 4; figure - *; | [A]US4217953 (KOIKE KIYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * column 2, line 6 - line 24; figure - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940914), vol. 018, no. 492, Database accession no. (M - 1673), & JP06159983 A 19940607 (SHOWA ALUM CORP) [A] 1-3 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880510), vol. 012, no. 149, Database accession no. (M - 694), & JP62268988 A 19871121 (NIPPON DENSO CO LTD) [X] 4,5 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891019), vol. 013, no. 462, Database accession no. (M - 881), & JP01181090 A 19890719 (NIPPON DENSO CO LTD) [X] 4 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990129), vol. 1999, no. 01, & JP10267462 A 19981009 (SHOWA ALUM CORP) [A] 4-8 * abstract * |