EP1168772 - METHOD FOR MANAGING THE OPERATION OF A MOBILE TERMINAL IN A TELECOMMUNICATIONS NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/01] | Method for managing the operation of a mobile terminal in a telecommunications network | ||
[2018/39] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.05.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.08.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.07.2019 [2019/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent Site Nokia Paris Saclay Route de Villejust 91620 Nozay / FR | [2018/16] |
Former [2014/34] | For all designated states ALCATEL LUCENT 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2012/08] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3 avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2007/14] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2002/01] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sykes, Francis 3 Villa Coeur de Vey 75014 Paris / FR | 02 /
Aidan, Bruno 3 bis, Cité Popincourt 75011 / FR | [2002/01] | Representative(s) | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2012/29] | Sciaux, Edmond, et al Alcatel-Lucent International Intellectual Property & Standards 32 Avenue Kléber 92700 Colombes / FR | ||
Former [2011/43] | Nicolle, Olivier, et al Alcatel-Lucent International 32 avenue Kléber 92700 Colombes / FR | ||
Former [2007/25] | Korakis-Ménager, Sophie, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2002/42] | Fournier, Michel Robert Marie, et al COMPAGNIE FINANCIERE ALCATEL Dépt. Propriété Industrielle, 30, avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2002/01] | Fournier, Michel, et al Companie Financière Alcatel, DPI, 30, Avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 01401673.7 | 25.06.2001 | [2002/01] | Priority number, date | FR20000008492 | 30.06.2000 Original published format: FR 0008492 | [2002/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1168772 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/725, H04M3/493 | [2018/35] | CPC: |
H04M1/72403 (EP,US);
H04M1/72445 (EP,US);
H04M1/7243 (EP,US);
H04M3/4931 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/01] | H04L29/08, H04M1/725, H04M1/247 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/01] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN FÜR DIE VERWALTUNG DES BETRIEBS EINES BEWEGLICHEN TERMINALS IN EINEM TELEKOMMUNIKATIONS NETZWERK | [2018/39] | English: | METHOD FOR MANAGING THE OPERATION OF A MOBILE TERMINAL IN A TELECOMMUNICATIONS NETWORK | [2018/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION DU FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN TERMINAL MOBILE DANS UN RESEAU DE TELECOMMUNICATION | [2018/39] |
Former [2002/01] | Verfahren für die Verwaltung des Betriebs eines beweglichen Terminals in einem Telekommunikations Netzwerk | ||
Former [2002/01] | Method for managing the operation of a mobile terminal in a telecommunications network | ||
Former [2002/01] | Procédé de gestion du fonctionnement d'un terminal mobile dans un reseau de telecommunication | Examination procedure | 02.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/36] | 27.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/27] | 14.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/27] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.04.2004 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 15.03.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 15.03.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.03.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 25.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 18 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | deleted | [2014/47] |
Former [2013/40] | ID: | 01 | |
For: | AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR | ||
Date: | 10.04.2013 | ||
[2014/47] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5923736 (SHACHAR YUVAL [IL]) [X] 1-4 * column 7, line 30 - column 9, line 37 * * column 10, line 25 - column 11, line 13 *; | [A] - "WAP WHITE PAPER", HTTP://WWW.WAPGUIDE.COM/WAPGUIDE, (199902), XP002901226 [A] 1-4 * page 9, line 1 - page 10, line 15 * |