EP1195500 - Process and device for lighting off a catalyst [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renault s.a.s. 13-15 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/34] | For all designated states Renault s.a.s. 13-15 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2002/15] | For all designated states Renault 13-15 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thaveau, Christophe 11 ter rue du Prieuré 45300 Sermaises / FR | [2006/23] |
Former [2002/15] | 01 /
Thaveau, Christophe 11 ter rue du Prieure 45300 Sermaises / FR | Application number, filing date | 01402573.8 | 05.10.2001 | [2002/15] | Priority number, date | FR20000012710 | 05.10.2000 Original published format: FR 0012710 | [2002/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1195500 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1195500 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/20, F01N3/22 | [2002/15] | CPC: |
F01N3/225 (EP);
F01N3/2006 (EP);
F01N3/2026 (EP);
F01N3/22 (EP);
F01N3/227 (EP);
F01N3/306 (EP);
F01N3/323 (EP);
F01N2430/06 (EP);
F01N3/30 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, GB, IT [2003/01] |
Former [2002/15] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Aktivieren eines Katalysators | [2002/15] | English: | Process and device for lighting off a catalyst | [2002/15] | French: | Procédé et dispositif d'amorcage d'un catalyseur | [2006/23] |
Former [2002/15] | Procede et dispositif d'amorcage d'un catalyseur | Examination procedure | 24.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/47] | 11.10.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 31.01.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, CY, DK, FI, FR, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 14.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.11.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.11.2002 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 23.08.2006 | IT | 23.08.2006 | BE | 31.10.2006 | ES | 04.12.2006 | [2009/37] |
Former [2007/36] | GB | 23.08.2006 | |
IT | 23.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/28] | GB | 23.08.2006 | |
ES | 04.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | ES | 04.12.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE19731739 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 7,8,10 * column 2, line 30 - column 4, line 19; figure 1 * [A] 1; | [XA]US5493858 (HOSOYA YASUHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 7,10,11,13,20 * column 19, line 28 - line 57 * * column 20, line 9 - line 17 * * column 20, line 30 - line 67; figures 39,40,43 * [A] 1,4,5; | [XA]US5675968 (KATASHIBA HIDEAKI [JP], et al) [X] 7,10,11,20 * column 3, line 63 - line 67 * * column 4, line 56 - column 7, line 34 * * column 11, line 12 - line 30; figures 1-3,5 * [A] 1,4,5; | [XA]US5666804 (SEKIYA MUTUO [JP], et al) [X] 7,14-18 * column 16, line 57 - column 18, line 26; figures 22-26 * [A] 1; | [A]US5390488 (AMENT FRANK [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4,6,7,11,12,20 * column 1, line 1 - column 6, line 11; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5456063 (YOSHIZAKI KOUJI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,4,6,7,14-18,20 * column 3, line 15 - column 8, line 59 * * column 10, line 66 - column 11, line 5; figures 1-3,7 *; | [A]US5388402 (AOKI TAKUYA [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,4,6,7,20 * column 2, line 66 - column 5, line 36 * * column 6, line 59 - column 7, line 19; figures 1-3,7 *; | [A]DE19646151 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2,4,6,7,20 * column 1, line 39 - line 45 * * column 4, line 34 - column 6, line 22; figures 3-5 *; | [A]GB2340054 (JOHNSON MATTHEY PLC [GB]) [A] 1,3,4,6,7,20 * page 1, line 22 - page 8, line 30; figure 1 *; | [A]US5519992 (HOSOYA YASUHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1,4,5,7,8,20 * column 40, line 27 - column 41, line 6; figure 22 * |