EP1199535 - Heat exchanger [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8315 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/17] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8315 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Katsuhiro, Saito, Mitsubishi Heavy Ind. Ltd. 1, Asahi-cho 3-chome, Nishi-biwajima-machi Nishi-kasugai-gun, Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Masashi, Inoue, Mitsubishi Heavy Ind. Ltd. 1, Asahi-cho 3-chome, Nishi-biwajima-machi Nishi-kasugai-gun, Aichi-ken / JP | [2002/17] | Representative(s) | Cardy, Sophie Marie, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/17] | Briat, Sophie, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 01402676.9 | 17.10.2001 | [2002/17] | Priority number, date | JP20000318443 | 18.10.2000 Original published format: JP 2000318443 | [2002/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1199535 | Date: | 24.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1199535 | Date: | 10.07.2002 | [2002/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1199535 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F28D1/03 | [2002/17] | CPC: |
F28F9/028 (EP,US);
F28D1/0333 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2003/14] |
Former [2002/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Wärmetauscher | [2002/17] | English: | Heat exchanger | [2002/17] | French: | Echangeur de chaleur | [2002/17] | Examination procedure | 13.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/42] | 27.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 17.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.02.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.02.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.02.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 18.02.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 18.02.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 18.02.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 18.02.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 18.02.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 18.02.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.02.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.02.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.02.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 18.02.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 18.02.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 18.02.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.02.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.02.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 07.01.2004 | [2006/14] | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]EP0769665 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [X] 1,7 * column 1, line 31 - line 57; figure 10 * * column 14, line 17 - line 33; figures 1,9 * [A] 6 [Y] 2-5; | [Y]JPH10325646 ; | [X]US5680773 (AIKAWA YASUKAZU [JP], et al) [X] 1,6 * column 2, line 60 - line 67; figure 1 *; | [A]US5979544 (INOUE SEIJI [JP]) [A] 2-5 * column 15, line 3 - line 59; figures 12-15 *; | [PA]DE10033965 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [PA] 2-5 * figures 19-21 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990331), vol. 1999, no. 03, & JP10325646 A 19981208 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [Y] 2-5 * abstract * |