EP1202464 - Method and device for managing a communication network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.03.2006 [2006/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/18] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Frouin, Laurent 78, rue de Sarzeau 35700 Rennes / FR | [2002/18] | Representative(s) | Santarelli Tour Trinity 1 bis Esplanade de la Défense 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/18] | Santarelli 14, avenue de la Grande Armée, B.P. 237 75822 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | ||
Former [2002/18] | Quantin, Bruno Marie Henri Rinuy, Santarelli, 14 Avenue de la Grande Armée, B.P. 237 75822 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 01402716.3 | 19.10.2001 | [2002/18] | Priority number, date | FR20000013879 | 27.10.2000 Original published format: FR 0013879 | [2002/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1202464 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1202464 | Date: | 23.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/20, H04L12/46 | [2002/18] | CPC: |
H04L41/0853 (EP,US);
H04B1/205 (EP,US);
H04L41/00 (EP,US);
H04L41/0803 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (EP,US);
H04N5/765 (EP,US);
H04L41/0893 (US);
H04L41/12 (EP,US);
H04L69/24 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/04] |
Former [2002/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum verwalten eines Kommunikationsnetzes | [2002/18] | English: | Method and device for managing a communication network | [2002/18] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour gerer un reseau de communication | [2002/18] | Examination procedure | 26.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/50] | 12.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05075013.2 / EP1521377 | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0696109 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-5,11,12 * abstract * * column 1, line 1 - column 7, line 45 ** figure 1 *; | [A]EP0837579 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * column 2, line 44 - column 16, line 41 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US5787259 (HAROUN WASSEF [US], et al) [A] 2-6,11,12 * abstract * * column 1, line 15 - column 3, line 44 * * figure 1 * * figure 2 *; | [A]EP0920139 (THOMSON BRANDT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0059230 (SONY ELECTRONICS INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * page 5, line 1 - page 14, line 15 * * page 23, line 25 - page 26, line 22 * * figure 2 * * figure 3 * |