EP1256881 - Method and apparatus for write protecting a gaming storage medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.05.2011 [2011/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WMS Gaming Inc 800 South Northpoint Boulevard Waukegan, Illinois 60085 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/46] | For all designated states WMS Gaming Inc 800 South Northpoint Boulevard Waukegan, Illinois 60085 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Canterbury, Stephen A. 40570 Lilac Place Antioch, Illinois 60002 / US | [2002/46] | Representative(s) | Maury, Richard Philip, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Maury, Richard Philip, et al Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2005/24] | Maury, Richard Philip, et al Mark & Clerk, 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2002/46] | Loisel, Bertrand Cabinet Plasseraud, 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75440 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 01403069.6 | 29.11.2001 | [2002/46] | Priority number, date | US20010851825 | 09.05.2001 Original published format: US 851825 | [2002/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1256881 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1256881 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | [2004/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/42, G11C7/24, G11C16/22 | [2004/06] | CPC: |
G06F12/1433 (EP,US);
G06F21/79 (EP,US);
G07F17/3223 (EP,US);
G07F17/3241 (EP,US);
G11C16/22 (EP,US);
G11C7/24 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2109 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2002/46] | G06F13/42 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB [2004/44] |
Former [2002/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anordnung zur Schreibschutz eines Spielspeichermediums | [2002/46] | English: | Method and apparatus for write protecting a gaming storage medium | [2002/46] | French: | Méthode et dispositif de protection en écriture d'un medium de stockage de jeu | [2002/46] | Examination procedure | 02.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/32] | 05.08.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 26.11.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 11.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/20] | 05.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/20] | Divisional application(s) | EP10014752.9 / EP2290555 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 16.02.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 16.02.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.03.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.09.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.09.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2010 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0431723 (SNK CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-18 * column 2, line 13 - column 3, line 38 * * column A; claims 1,2 *; | [Y]US5668760 (HAZEN PETER K [US]) [Y] 1-18 * column 1, line 32 - line 56 * * column 2, line 35 - line 48 * * column 5, line 17 - column 6, line 2 * * column A; figures 2,3 *; | [A]US5912849 (YASU YOSHIHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-18 * column 1, line 45 - line 67 * * column 2, line 19 - line 45 ** column A * | Examination | US5507491 |