EP1213183 - Rear view mirror and fastening system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 05.09.2007 [2007/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renault s.a.s. 13-15 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/34] | For all designated states Renault s.a.s. 13-15 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2002/24] | For all designated states Renault 13-15 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Curbilie, Pascal 67 avenue du Général Leclerc 95250 Beauchamp / FR | 02 /
Guilbert, Olivier 5, rue des Pointes, Hameau de Boigneville 28130 Yermenonville / FR | 03 /
Limon, Alain 50, Allée de la Forêt 92360 Meudon La Forèt / FR | [2002/24] | Application number, filing date | 01403163.7 | 07.12.2001 | [2002/24] | Priority number, date | FR20000015854 | 07.12.2000 Original published format: FR 0015854 | [2002/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1213183 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1213183 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B60R1/06 | [2002/24] | CPC: |
B60R1/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, GB, IT [2003/10] |
Former [2002/24] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Rückblickspiegel und Befestigungssystem | [2002/24] | English: | Rear view mirror and fastening system | [2002/24] | French: | Rétroviseur extérieur et système de fixation | [2002/24] | Examination procedure | 02.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/06] | 13.12.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.04.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, CY, DK, FI, FR, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 19.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.01.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 22.09.2004 | IT | 22.09.2004 | ES | 02.01.2005 | [2007/36] |
Former [2005/46] | GB | 22.09.2004 | |
ES | 02.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | ES | 02.01.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2852555 (FERSTL PETER) [A] 1,3,4 * claim 1 *; | [A]US2516939 (ANDERSON JR JAMES W); | [A]US2495123 (MORLEY CHARLES E); | [A]DE3510780 (AUDI AG); | [A]DE2320056 (ENGELMANN JOACHIM) |