EP1233333 - Process for executing a downloadable service receiving restrictive access rights to al least one profile file [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.11.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto CA 94304-1112 / US | ||
Former [2002/34] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Raffaele, Eric 23 rue Genissieu 38000 Grenoble / FR | 02 /
Brebner, Gavin 191 route de Pierval 38410 Saint Martin d'Uriage / FR | [2002/34] | Representative(s) | Lloyd, Richard Graham Hewlett Packard Espanola, SL Legal Department Cami de Can Graells, 1-21 08174 Saint Cugat del Vallés Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Lloyd, Richard Graham Hewlett Packard CCF IP Section - Legal Department 5, Avenue Raymond Chanas-Eybens 38053 Grenoble Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2002/34] | Lloyd, Richard Graham Intellectual Property Section, Legal Department, HEWLETT-PACKARD FRANCE, Etablissement de Grenoble 38053 Grenoble Cedex 9 / FR | Application number, filing date | 01410021.8 | 19.02.2001 | [2002/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1233333 | Date: | 21.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/445 | [2002/34] | CPC: |
G06F9/468 (EP,US);
G06F21/6263 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99936 (US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/20] |
Former [2002/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Ausführung eines herunterladbaren Dienstes mittels des Empfangs einschränkender Zugriffrechte mindestens einer Profildatei | [2002/34] | English: | Process for executing a downloadable service receiving restrictive access rights to al least one profile file | [2002/34] | French: | Procédé pour exécuter un service téléchargeable avec réception de droits d'accès restrictifs pour au moins un fichier de profiles | [2002/34] | Examination procedure | 06.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/16] | 27.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/01] | 12.08.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5870544 (CURTIS BRYCE ALLEN [US]) [A] 1,2,6-8,12,13,15 * abstract * * column 6, line 31 - column 7, line 26 *; | [YA]WO9916003 (BELARC INC [US]) [Y] 5,8 * abstract * * page 11, line 22 - page 13, line 3 * * page 14, line 25 - page 15, line 24 * * page 17, line 12 - line 20 * [A] 1,2,4,9-11,14; | [XAY] - VENNERS B., "SECURITY AND THE CLASS LOADER ARCHITECTURE", JAVAWORLD, IDG COMMUNICATIONS, (199709), pages 1 - 7, URL: http://www.javaworld.com/javaworld/jw-09-1997/jw-09-hood_p.html, (20010709), XP002171444 [X] 1,2,4,6,7,13,15 * page 1, line 17 - page 2, line 2 * * page 2, line 16 - page 3, line 35 * * page 5, line 29 - line 44 * [A] 3,9-12 [Y] 5,8 | [XA] - GONG L., "JAVA SECURITY ARCHITECTURE (JDK 1.2). Version 1.0.", (19981206), pages 1 - 62, URL: http://java.sun.com/people/gong/papers/jdk12spec.pdf, (20010709), XP002171445 [X] 1,2,4,6,7,13,15 * paragraph [01.2] * * paragraph [04.1] - paragraph [04.4] * * paragraph [05.1] - paragraph [05.4] * * paragraph [07.1] - paragraph [07.2] * [A] 3,5,8,12 | [A] - KOVED K., NADALIN A. J., NEAL D., LAWSON T., "THE EVOLUTION OF JAVA SECURITY", IBM SYSTEM JOURNAL, (1998), vol. 37, no. 3, pages 1 - 14, XP002144222 [A] 1,6,7 * page 4, line 1 - page 6, line 5 * |