EP1133960 - Adjustable cervical collar [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2008 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RICHARD FRERES S.A. Zone Artisanale du Puits du Crêt 42560 Saint Genest Lerpt / FR | [2001/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Richard, Dominique 18, route de Saint Paul 43110 Aurec sur Loire / FR | [2001/38] | Representative(s) | Maureau, Philippe, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU 12, rue Boileau B.P. 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Maureau, Philippe, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU 12 Rue Boileau B.P. 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | ||
Former [2003/05] | Maureau, Philippe, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU, BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | ||
Former [2001/38] | Perrier, Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU 12 rue de la République 42000 St-Etienne / FR | Application number, filing date | 01420046.3 | 21.02.2001 | [2001/38] | Priority number, date | FR20000003418 | 13.03.2000 Original published format: FR 0003418 | [2001/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1133960 | Date: | 19.09.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1133960 | Date: | 11.04.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/055 | [2001/38] | CPC: |
A61F5/055 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/23] |
Former [2001/38] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verstellbare Cervicalstütze | [2001/38] | English: | Adjustable cervical collar | [2001/38] | French: | Collier cervical à maintien réglable | [2001/38] | Examination procedure | 07.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/20] | 12.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.07.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 27.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/12] | Request for further processing for: | 27.09.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 27.09.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.10.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.04.2007 | CY | 11.04.2007 | DK | 11.04.2007 | FI | 11.04.2007 | GB | 11.04.2007 | IE | 11.04.2007 | NL | 11.04.2007 | TR | 11.04.2007 | SE | 11.07.2007 | GR | 12.07.2007 | PT | 11.09.2007 | [2010/37] |
Former [2009/33] | AT | 11.04.2007 | |
CY | 11.04.2007 | ||
DK | 11.04.2007 | ||
FI | 11.04.2007 | ||
GB | 11.04.2007 | ||
IE | 11.04.2007 | ||
NL | 11.04.2007 | ||
SE | 11.07.2007 | ||
GR | 12.07.2007 | ||
PT | 11.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 11.04.2007 | |
DK | 11.04.2007 | ||
FI | 11.04.2007 | ||
GB | 11.04.2007 | ||
IE | 11.04.2007 | ||
NL | 11.04.2007 | ||
SE | 11.07.2007 | ||
GR | 12.07.2007 | ||
PT | 11.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | AT | 11.04.2007 | |
DK | 11.04.2007 | ||
FI | 11.04.2007 | ||
IE | 11.04.2007 | ||
NL | 11.04.2007 | ||
SE | 11.07.2007 | ||
PT | 11.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 11.04.2007 | |
DK | 11.04.2007 | ||
FI | 11.04.2007 | ||
NL | 11.04.2007 | ||
SE | 11.07.2007 | ||
PT | 11.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 11.04.2007 | |
DK | 11.04.2007 | ||
FI | 11.04.2007 | ||
SE | 11.07.2007 | ||
PT | 11.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 11.04.2007 | |
FI | 11.04.2007 | ||
SE | 11.07.2007 | ||
PT | 11.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | FI | 11.04.2007 | |
SE | 11.07.2007 | ||
PT | 11.09.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5180361 (MOORE GEORGE E [US], et al); | [Y]FR2704424 (RICHARD FRERES SA [FR]) [Y] 1-7 * abstract *; | [YD]US5403266 (BRAGG STEVEN [US], et al) [YD] 1-7 * column 3, line 42 - column 4, line 26; figures 2,3 *; | [A]US5728054 (MARTIN WILLIAM [US]) | by applicant | US5403266 |