EP1139002 - Method for disconnecting the end of conduit from a connector and connecting device therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.08.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMAP société anonyme 16, avenue Paul Santy F-69008 Lyon / FR | For all designated states LEGRIS S.A. 74 rue de Paris F-35000 Rennes / FR | [2001/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Le Quere, Philippe 1, allée Champ Doret 35830 Betton / FR | 02 /
Tuffe, Stéphane 56, rue du Docteur Schweitzer 69740 Genas / FR | 03 /
Sellier, Marc 21, avenue des Grands Billons 45450 Donnery / FR | [2001/40] | Representative(s) | Maureau, Philippe, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU 12, rue Boileau B.P. 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/40] | Maureau, Philippe, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU, 12, rue Boileau, BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 01420058.8 | 06.03.2001 | [2001/40] | Priority number, date | FR20000004073 | 30.03.2000 Original published format: FR 0004073 | FR20000004876 | 14.04.2000 Original published format: FR 0004876 | [2001/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1139002 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1139002 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F16L37/084 | [2001/40] | CPC: |
F16L37/0915 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/26] |
Former [2001/40] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Trennung eines Rohrendes von einer Kupplung und Anschlussvorrichtung hierfür | [2001/40] | English: | Method for disconnecting the end of conduit from a connector and connecting device therefor | [2001/40] | French: | Procédé de déconnexion d'une extrémité de conduite hors d'un raccord et dispositif de raccordement correspondant | [2001/40] | Examination procedure | 02.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/01] | 30.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.03.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 28.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/37] | Request for further processing for: | 28.04.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 28.04.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.05.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 05.10.2005 | TR | 05.10.2005 | LU | 31.03.2006 | MC | 31.03.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/37] | TR | 05.10.2005 | |
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | LU | 31.03.2006 | |
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/46] | MC | 31.03.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4593943 (HAMA TOMIO [JP], et al) [A] 1,6* figure - *; | [A]DE4304241 (HUMMEL ANTON VERWALTUNG [DE]) [A] 1,2,4-9 * figures 1,16,17 * |