EP1145742 - Alpine ski [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.12.2005 [2005/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SKIS ROSSIGNOL SA BP 329 38500 Voiron / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/34] | For all designated states Skis Rossignol SA BP 329 38500 Voiron / FR | ||
Former [2001/42] | For all designated states SKIS ROSSIGNOL S.A. Rue Butterlin, BP 329, Le Menon F-38509 Voiron Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cuzzit, M. Daniel 4 lot Le Bas du Pavé 38140 La Murette / FR | 02 /
Billon, M. Pierre 22 rue Genevoise 38500 Voiron / FR | 03 /
Restani, M. Eric 15 rue Paul Painlevé 38500 Voiron / FR | 04 /
Schrobiltgen, M. Thierry La Bohème 73610 Attignat-Oncin / FR | 05 /
Stefanova, Milena Le Sappey 38220 St Barthelemy de Sechilienne / FR | [2001/42] | Representative(s) | Maureau, Philippe, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU 12, rue Boileau B.P. 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/42] | Maureau, Philippe, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU, 12, rue Boileau, BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 01420085.1 | 09.04.2001 | [2001/42] | Priority number, date | FR20000004877 | 14.04.2000 Original published format: FR 0004877 | [2001/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1145742 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1145742 | Date: | 22.12.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A63C5/07 | [2001/42] | CPC: |
A63C5/07 (EP,US);
A63C9/003 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, IT [2002/27] |
Former [2001/42] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Alpiner Ski | [2001/42] | English: | Alpine ski | [2001/42] | French: | Ski alpin | [2001/42] | Examination procedure | 26.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/04] | 18.04.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.08.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 06.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 24.05.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2002 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5232241 (KNOTT WALTER P [US], et al) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]US5803478 (GAVALIS RICHARD CLIFFORD [US]) [A] 1 * column W *; | [AD]FR2763861 (ROSSIGNOL SA [FR]) [AD] 1* the whole document * | by applicant | CH671887 | FR2763861 |