EP1153877 - Method and device for the simulation of loads on lifting apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.2005 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.05.2005 [2005/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POTAIN 18 rue de Charbonnières 69130 Ecully / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/46] | For all designated states POTAIN 18 rue de Charbonnières F-69130 Ecully / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dubois, M. Frédéric Rue Chantemerle 42190 Charlieu / FR | [2001/46] | Representative(s) | Bratel, Gérard, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau 12, rue Boileau BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/46] | Bratel, Gérard, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU, 12, rue Boileau, BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 01420095.0 | 24.04.2001 | [2001/46] | Priority number, date | FR20000006097 | 12.05.2000 Original published format: FR 0006097 | [2001/46] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1153877 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1153877 | Date: | 26.05.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B66C23/90 | [2001/46] | CPC: |
B66C23/90 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, IT, LI [2002/31] |
Former [2001/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung für das Simulieren von Lasten an Hebezeugen | [2001/46] | English: | Method and device for the simulation of loads on lifting apparatus | [2001/46] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la simulation de charges sur des appareils de levage | [2001/46] | Examination procedure | 25.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/23] | 15.05.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.09.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CY, DK, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 10.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 26.06.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.06.2002 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE2140779 (PIETZSCH LUDWIG); | [AD]US4509377 (MENTZELL WALTER J [US], et al) [AD] 1,8 * column W *; | [AD]DE3341414 (BLAIMER ALBERT DIPL KAUFM); | [AD]US4643031 (MENTZELL WALTER J [US]); | [AD]DE3644451 (HOFFMANN KARSTEN DIPL ING [DE]); | [AD]EP0866022 (HANS WARNER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [AD] 1,8 * the whole document * |