EP1184328 - Cable arrangement for tower crane [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2007 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POTAIN 18 rue de Charbonnières 69130 Ecully / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/10] | For all designated states POTAIN 18 rue de Charbonnières F-69130 Ecully / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Verchere, Jean-Paul Les Bruyères 42190 Saint Nizier sous Charlieu / FR | 02 /
Gevaudant, Olivier 44, Boulevard Thiers 42190 Charlieu / FR | [2002/10] | Representative(s) | Bratel, Gérard, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau 12, rue Boileau BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/10] | Bratel, Gérard, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU, 12, rue Boileau, BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 01420168.5 | 23.07.2001 | [2002/10] | Priority number, date | FR20000011095 | 30.08.2000 Original published format: FR 0011095 | [2002/10] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1184328 | Date: | 06.03.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1184328 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B66C11/18, B66C23/68 | [2002/10] | CPC: |
B66C23/68 (EP,US);
B66C11/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, IT [2002/48] |
Former [2002/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Seilanordnung für einen Turmkran | [2002/10] | English: | Cable arrangement for tower crane | [2002/10] | French: | Circuit de câble de distribution pour grue à tour | [2002/10] | Examination procedure | 15.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/37] | 07.09.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.12.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, CY, DK, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 18.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 24.10.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2002 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 31.07.2006 | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/36] | IT | 07.06.2006 | |
BE | 31.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/31] | BE | 31.07.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0414646 (FERRERI ANDREA [IT]) [DA] 1 * the whole document * |