EP1195726 - Control element of a coin escapement and coin collection device comprising such a control piece [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.07.2003 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.09.2003 [2003/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MECELEC INDUSTRIES 07300 Mauves / FR | [2002/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Benoist, Etienne 39, rue du Colombier 07300 Saint Jean de Muzols / FR | 02 /
Werenfrid, François 194, Avenue du Colonel Rousset 07130 Cornas / FR | [2002/15] | Representative(s) | Myon, Gérard Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Lavoix 62, rue de Bonnel 69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/15] | Myon, Gérard Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Lavoix Lyon 62, rue de Bonnel 69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | Application number, filing date | 01420201.4 | 04.10.2001 | [2002/15] | Priority number, date | FR20000012743 | 05.10.2000 Original published format: FR 0012743 | [2002/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1195726 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G07F1/04 | [2002/15] | CPC: |
G07D3/121 (EP);
G07F1/047 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2003/01] |
Former [2002/15] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Bedienelement einer Münzhemmung und ein solches Bedienelement enthaltende Münzkassiervorrichtung | [2002/15] | English: | Control element of a coin escapement and coin collection device comprising such a control piece | [2002/15] | French: | Pièce de commande de l'échappement de pièces de monnaie, et dispositif d'encaissement progressif de pièces de monnaie comportant une telle pièce de commande | [2002/15] | Examination procedure | 11.10.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/36] | 12.02.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/36] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.11.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2002 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 20.11.2002 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0174258 (MECELEC SA [FR]) [DA] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0174258 |