EP1122475 - Safety valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states T D Williamson France SA (Société Anonyme) Z.I 11, rue de l'Atome 67800 Bischheim / FR | [2001/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cartereau, Sylvain 6c, rue Muhlmatt 67210 Valff / FR | 02 /
Andris, Thierry 11, rue du Castel 67870 Bischoffsheim / FR | [2001/32] | Representative(s) | Nuss, Pierre, et al Cabinet Nuss 10 Rue Jacques Kablé 67080 Strasbourg Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/32] | Nuss, Pierre, et al 10, rue Jacques Kablé 67080 Strasbourg Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 01440018.8 | 29.01.2001 | [2001/32] | Priority number, date | FR20000001258 | 01.02.2000 Original published format: FR 0001258 | [2001/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1122475 | Date: | 08.08.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1122475 | Date: | 20.10.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F16K17/30 | [2001/32] | CPC: |
F16K17/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/18] |
Former [2001/32] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Sicherheitsventil | [2001/32] | English: | Safety valve | [2001/32] | French: | Dispositif d'obturation de sécurité pour conduites | [2001/32] | Examination procedure | 17.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/13] | 07.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.10.2004 | FI | 20.10.2004 | GB | 20.10.2004 | IE | 20.10.2004 | IT | 20.10.2004 | NL | 20.10.2004 | TR | 20.10.2004 | DK | 20.01.2005 | GR | 20.01.2005 | SE | 20.01.2005 | DE | 21.01.2005 | CY | 29.01.2005 | LU | 29.01.2005 | BE | 31.01.2005 | CH | 31.01.2005 | ES | 31.01.2005 | LI | 31.01.2005 | MC | 31.01.2005 | PT | 20.03.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/36] | AT | 20.10.2004 | |
FI | 20.10.2004 | ||
GB | 20.10.2004 | ||
IE | 20.10.2004 | ||
IT | 20.10.2004 | ||
NL | 20.10.2004 | ||
TR | 20.10.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
SE | 20.01.2005 | ||
DE | 21.01.2005 | ||
CY | 29.01.2005 | ||
LU | 29.01.2005 | ||
BE | 31.01.2005 | ||
CH | 31.01.2005 | ||
ES | 31.01.2005 | ||
LI | 31.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 20.10.2004 | |
FI | 20.10.2004 | ||
GB | 20.10.2004 | ||
IE | 20.10.2004 | ||
NL | 20.10.2004 | ||
TR | 20.10.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
SE | 20.01.2005 | ||
DE | 21.01.2005 | ||
CY | 29.01.2005 | ||
LU | 29.01.2005 | ||
BE | 31.01.2005 | ||
CH | 31.01.2005 | ||
ES | 31.01.2005 | ||
LI | 31.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2007/09] | AT | 20.10.2004 | |
FI | 20.10.2004 | ||
GB | 20.10.2004 | ||
IE | 20.10.2004 | ||
NL | 20.10.2004 | ||
TR | 20.10.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
SE | 20.01.2005 | ||
DE | 21.01.2005 | ||
LU | 29.01.2005 | ||
BE | 31.01.2005 | ||
CH | 31.01.2005 | ||
ES | 31.01.2005 | ||
LI | 31.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 20.10.2004 | |
FI | 20.10.2004 | ||
GB | 20.10.2004 | ||
IE | 20.10.2004 | ||
NL | 20.10.2004 | ||
TR | 20.10.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
DE | 21.01.2005 | ||
BE | 31.01.2005 | ||
CH | 31.01.2005 | ||
ES | 31.01.2005 | ||
LI | 31.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 20.10.2004 | |
FI | 20.10.2004 | ||
GB | 20.10.2004 | ||
IE | 20.10.2004 | ||
NL | 20.10.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
DE | 21.01.2005 | ||
BE | 31.01.2005 | ||
CH | 31.01.2005 | ||
ES | 31.01.2005 | ||
LI | 31.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 20.10.2004 | |
FI | 20.10.2004 | ||
GB | 20.10.2004 | ||
IE | 20.10.2004 | ||
NL | 20.10.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
DE | 21.01.2005 | ||
BE | 31.01.2005 | ||
ES | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 20.10.2004 | |
FI | 20.10.2004 | ||
IE | 20.10.2004 | ||
DK | 20.01.2005 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
ES | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 20.10.2004 | |
FI | 20.10.2004 | ||
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
ES | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | FI | 20.10.2004 | |
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
ES | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | FI | 20.10.2004 | |
GR | 20.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 20.10.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3872884 (BUSDIECKER WAYNE S, et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US4129144 (ANDERSSON BO ALLAN, et al) [A] 1* figures 1-10 *; | [A]DE2924533 (GOK GMBH & CO KG) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US4257443 (TURNEY LARRY R) [A] 1 * figures 1-4 *; | [DA]US5293898 (MASLOFF PETER [AT]) [DA] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5551476 (MCGINNIS JOSEPH M [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0491027 |