EP1270972 - Telescopic guide system of an inner tube in an outer tubular envelope [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 20.12.2006 [2006/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STEELCASE SA 56 Rue Jean Giraudoux 67200 Strasbourg / FR | [2003/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lerat, Pascal 7, rue des Comtes 67200 Strasbourg / FR | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | Littolff, Denis Meyer & Partenaires 2 rue de Dublin 67300 Schiltigheim / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | Littolff, Denis Meyer & Partenaires, Conseils en Propriété Industrielle, Bureaux Europe, 20, place des Halles 67000 Strasbourg / FR | Application number, filing date | 01440187.1 | 21.06.2001 | [2003/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1270972 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1270972 | Date: | 25.08.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F16C29/04, A47B9/20 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
A47B9/20 (EP);
F16C29/04 (EP);
A47B2220/0025 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/01] | Title | German: | Teleskopische Führungseinrichtung eines inneren Rohres in einer äusseren rohrförmigen Umhüllung | [2003/01] | English: | Telescopic guide system of an inner tube in an outer tubular envelope | [2003/01] | French: | Système de guidage télescopique d'un tube interne dans une enveloppe tubulaire externe | [2003/01] | Examination procedure | 14.07.2001 | Examination requested [2003/01] | 14.07.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 27.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2003 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 04.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.08.2004 | FI | 25.08.2004 | IE | 25.08.2004 | TR | 25.08.2004 | DK | 25.11.2004 | GR | 25.11.2004 | SE | 25.11.2004 | [2006/51] |
Former [2005/24] | AT | 25.08.2004 | |
FI | 25.08.2004 | ||
IE | 25.08.2004 | ||
DK | 25.11.2004 | ||
GR | 25.11.2004 | ||
SE | 25.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 25.08.2004 | |
FI | 25.08.2004 | ||
DK | 25.11.2004 | ||
GR | 25.11.2004 | ||
SE | 25.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 25.08.2004 | |
FI | 25.08.2004 | ||
GR | 25.11.2004 | ||
SE | 25.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 25.08.2004 | |
FI | 25.08.2004 | ||
SE | 25.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 25.08.2004 | |
SE | 25.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 25.11.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3887155 (BERTALOT SILVIO) [A] * column 2, line 15 - column 3, line 8; figures 1-4 *; | [XA]DE2656822 (SPOETZL MARKUS) [X] 1,9 * page 22, line 26 - page 23, line 11; figure 15; claims 1,10 * [A] 2; | [A]DE3124927 (SCHAEFFLER WAELZLAGER KG [DE]) [A] 1-7 * page 3, line 32 - page 4, line 21; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE3813422 (LEMFOERDER METALLWAREN AG [DE]) [A] 1-7 * column 3, line 32 - column 4, line 13; figures 11,12 * | Examination | DE19623437 |