EP1199272 - Precision splicing device for an nonstop unwinding machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.09.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.11.2002 [2002/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MONOMATIC, S.A. 48 rue de l'Engelbreit 67200 Strasbourg / FR | [2002/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Muller, Bernard 2 Impasse du Foin 67410 Drusenheim / FR | 02 /
Dumas, Jean-Louis 10 rue du Luspel 68500 Guebwiller / FR | [2002/17] | Representative(s) | Nuss, Pierre, et al Cabinet Nuss 10 Rue Jacques Kablé 67080 Strasbourg Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/17] | Nuss, Pierre, et al Cabinet Nuss 10, rue Jacques Kablé 67080 Strasbourg Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 01440325.7 | 01.10.2001 | [2002/17] | Priority number, date | FR20000012534 | 02.10.2000 Original published format: FR 0012534 | FR20010001811 | 09.02.2001 Original published format: FR 0101811 | [2002/17] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1199272 | Date: | 24.04.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B65H21/02, B65H19/18 | [2002/17] | CPC: |
B65H19/123 (EP,US);
B65H16/06 (EP,US);
B65H2301/41346 (EP,US);
B65H2601/325 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Präzisionspleissen in einer Nonstopabwickelmaschine | [2002/17] | English: | Precision splicing device for an nonstop unwinding machine | [2002/17] | French: | Dispositif de raccordement de précision pour une machine à dérouler en continu | [2002/17] | Examination procedure | 20.09.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/46] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5316230 (FOCKE HEINZ [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,17 * column 2, line 57 - column 7, line 7; figure - * [Y] 3,4,10; | [Y]EP0940360 (FOCKE & CO [DE]) [Y] 3,4,10 * column 3, line 7 - column 13, line 32; figure - * |