EP1116437 - Cage for fish-farming [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.09.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.10.2004 [2004/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Galvez Pie, Jordi Moll Comercial s/n 08800 Vilanova i la Geltru (Barcelona) / ES | [2001/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/29] | Representative(s) | Durán Moya, Carlos, et al DURAN-CORRETJER Còrsega, 329 (Paseo de Gracia/Diagonal) 08037 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2001/29] | Duran Moya, Carlos, et al c/o DURAN-CORRETJER, Paseo de Gracia 101 pral. 08008 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 01500005.2 | 10.01.2001 | [2001/29] | Priority number, date | ES20000000076 | 14.01.2000 Original published format: ES 200000076 | [2001/29] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1116437 | Date: | 18.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1116437 | Date: | 25.06.2003 | [2003/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A01K61/00 | [2001/29] | CPC: |
A01K61/60 (EP);
Y02A40/81 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/12] |
Former [2001/29] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Käfig für Fischzucht | [2001/29] | English: | Cage for fish-farming | [2001/29] | French: | Cage pour élevage de poisson | [2001/29] | Examination procedure | 30.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/43] | 17.05.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.02.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 16.02.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]FR2507436 (CARL INGENIERIE SA [FR]) [X] 1-3 * page 1, line 20 - line 27 * * page 2, line 22 - line 35 * * page 3, line 8 - line 12; figures 1,2 * [Y] 5-7,9,13; | [Y]US5628279 (BONES IV JOHN W [US]) [Y] 5-7,9,13 * column 3, line 10 - line 20 * * column 3, line 59 - line 67 * * column 4, line 43 - line 67; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US4909186 (NAKAMUNE HIDEO [JP], et al) |