EP1184103 - A method for producing a sheet metal container, such a container and an apparatus for performing the method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.2007 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.10.2007 [2007/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CONSAFE ApS c/o Metalvarefabriken Baltic A/S 130 Amager Strandvej 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | [2006/43] |
Former [2002/10] | For all designated states CONSAFE ApS c/o Metalvarefabriken Baltic A/S 130 Amager Strandvej 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sebbelov, Lars Erik Gartnersvinget 4 3220 Tilvildeleje / DK | [2002/10] | Representative(s) | Joergensen, Bjoern Barker, et al Awapatent A/S Rigensgade 11 1316 Copenhagen K / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2002/10] | Jorgensen, Bjorn Barker, et al Internationalt Patent-Bureau, Hoje Taastrup Boulevard 23 2630 Taastrup / DK | Application number, filing date | 01610091.9 | 29.08.2001 | [2002/10] | Priority number, date | DK20000001294 | 01.09.2000 Original published format: DK 200001294 | [2002/10] | Filing language | DA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1184103 | Date: | 06.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1184103 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | [2003/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1184103 | Date: | 25.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B21D51/26, B65D8/04 | [2002/10] | CPC: |
B21D51/2615 (EP);
B65D7/36 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/10] | Extension states | AL | 18.11.2003 | LT | 18.11.2003 | LV | 18.11.2003 | MK | 18.11.2003 | RO | 18.11.2003 | SI | 18.11.2003 | Title | German: | Ein Verfahren zum Herstellen eines Blechbehälters, ein solcher Blechbehälter und eine Vorrichtung zum Durchführen des Verfahrens | [2002/10] | English: | A method for producing a sheet metal container, such a container and an apparatus for performing the method | [2002/10] | French: | Un procédé pour la fabrication d' un récipient en tôle, un tel récipient et un appareil pour la mise en oeuvre dudit procédé | [2002/10] | Examination procedure | 18.11.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/03] | 18.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3953994 (BRAWNER WILLIAM H, et al); | [XA]EP0033912 (ZUECHNER BLECHWAREN [DE]) [X] 6-9 * the whole document * [A] 1,10; | [A]US5022254 (KRAMER ANTONIO H [BR]) |