EP1308297 - A printer and a method of printing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.02.2012 [2012/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [2011/10] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company (a Delaware Corporation) 3000 Hanover Street Palo ALto CA 94304 / US | ||
Former [2003/19] | For all designated states Hewlett Packard Company, a Delaware Corporation 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
De Pena, Sascha Repartidor, 6 1 4a 08023 Barcelona / ES | [2003/19] | Representative(s) | Lippich, Wolfgang, et al Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/28] | Lippich, Wolfgang, et al Samson & Partner Patentanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/03] | Durville, Guillaume, et al Hewlett Packard Española, S.L. Legal Department Avda. Graells ,501 Sant Cugat del Vallès 08174 Barcelona / ES | ||
Former [2003/19] | Boyce, Conor, et al F. R. Kelly & Co., 27 Clyde Road, Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 01650130.6 | 31.10.2001 | [2003/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1308297 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1308297 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/505, G06K15/10 | [2003/19] | CPC: |
B41J2/5056 (EP,US);
B41J2/2132 (EP,US);
G06K15/107 (EP,US);
G06K2215/101 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [2004/05] |
Former [2003/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Drucker und Druckverfahren | [2003/19] | English: | A printer and a method of printing | [2003/19] | French: | Imprimante et procédé d'impression | [2003/19] | Examination procedure | 14.10.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/02] | 05.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.09.2010 | 10.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 17.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0430451 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 15 * column 2, line 15 - line 44 *; | [X]EP0729838 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 15 * page 1, line 43 - page 2, line 5 * * page 2, line 16 - line 20 * * page 4, line 15 - line 18 ** page 5, line 33 - page 6, line 1 *; | [X]EP0979734 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1,2,13,14 * column 2, line 13 * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0040] *; | [X]WO0030856 (XAAR TECHNOLOGY LTD [GB], et al) [X] 15,16 * page 1, line 14 - page 2, line 15 * |