EP1315330 - A mobile device provisioning system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.07.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Markport Limited Custom House Plaza 5 Harbourmaster Place Dublin 1 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/22] | For all designated states Markport Limited Custom House Plaza 5 Harbourmaster Place Dublin 1 / IE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
O'Connor, Padraig "Lus Mor", Rockhill Grenagh, County Cork / IE | 02 /
Somers, Fergus 64 Father Mathew Road, Turners Cross Cork City, County Cork / IE | [2003/22] | Representative(s) | Weldon, Michael James, et al John A. O'Brien & Associates Unit 4, The Courtyard Business Centre Orchard Lane Blackrock, County Dublin, A94 NV07 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/22] | Weldon, Michael James, et al c/o John A. O'Brien & Associates, Third Floor, Duncairn House, 14 Carysfort Avenue Blackrock, Co. Dublin / IE | Application number, filing date | 01650139.7 | 21.11.2001 | [2003/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1315330 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/24, H04L29/08, H04Q7/32 | [2003/22] | CPC: |
H04L41/0843 (EP);
H04L67/02 (EP);
H04L67/04 (EP);
H04L67/12 (EP);
H04L69/329 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2004/08] |
Former [2003/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | System zum Konfigurieren von tragbaren Geräten | [2003/22] | English: | A mobile device provisioning system | [2003/22] | French: | Système pour configurer des appareils portables | [2003/22] | Examination procedure | 29.11.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/38] | 13.04.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/38] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.01.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 16.01.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9716929 (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB], et al) [A] 4-6,8* page 27, line 18 - page 28, line 2 *; | [X]US6243747 (LEWIS LUNDY [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A] - WIRELESS APPLICATION PROTOCOL WAP-183-PROVCONT-20010724A, Provisioning Content, HTTP://WWW.WAPFORUM.ORG/, WIRELESS APPLICATION PROTOCOL FORUM, LTD., (20010724), XP002212294 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * |