EP1152442 - Keypad structure with inverted domes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.2008 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.07.2008 [2008/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2002/11] |
Former [2001/45] | For all designated states NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD. Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaikuranta, Terho Sorvakuja 7 20760 Piispanristi / FI | 02 /
Svarfvar, Bror Vaakunatie 7 A 4 20780 Kaarina / FI | [2001/45] | Representative(s) | Brax, Matti Juhani Berggren Oy P.O. Box 16 00101 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2001/45] | Brax, Matti Juhani Berggren Oy Ab, P.O. Box 16 00101 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 01660075.1 | 26.04.2001 | [2001/45] | Priority number, date | FI20000001017 | 02.05.2000 Original published format: FI 20001017 | [2001/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1152442 | Date: | 07.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1152442 | Date: | 10.03.2004 | [2004/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1152442 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01H13/70 | [2001/45] | CPC: |
G06F3/0202 (EP,US);
H01H13/702 (EP,US);
H04M1/22 (EP,US);
H01H2215/02 (EP,US);
H01H2219/014 (EP,US);
H01H2219/037 (EP,US);
H01H2219/039 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2004/49] |
Former [2001/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Tastaturstruktur mit umgekehrten Kuppen | [2001/45] | English: | Keypad structure with inverted domes | [2001/45] | French: | Structure de clavier à dômes inversés | [2001/45] | Examination procedure | 23.03.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/23] | 11.09.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.01.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, PT, SE, TR | 28.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.10.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.10.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.10.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 15.10.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 15.10.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 15.10.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 15.10.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 15.10.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.10.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.10.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.10.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 15.10.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 15.10.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.10.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.10.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4307268 (HARPER WILLIAM P) [X] 1,2 * figures 1-4 * * column 4, line 31 - column 6, line 8 * [Y] 3-7,10; | [Y]US5971557 (KUBES JOSEPH [US], et al) [Y] 3-5 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0503197 (LUCAS DURALITH CORP [US]) [Y] 6,10 * figure - * * column 3, line 40 - column 4, line 2 * * column 6, line 7 - line 40 *; | [Y]US4343975 (SADO RYOICHI) [Y] 7 * abstract *; | [X]US3928741 (COMER JERRY L) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5960942 (THORNTON CURTIS W [US]) [A] 1,3 * abstract * | Examination | JPH08148056 |