EP1161897 - Restaurant service counter and a method for using same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Finnfuture OY Kirrinpolku 4 40270 Palokka / FI | [2001/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rautiainen, Taavi Vihtavuorentie 15 41330 Vihtavuori / FI | [2001/50] | Representative(s) | Hakola, Unto Tapani Tampereen Patenttitoimisto Oy Visiokatu 1 33720 Tampere / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2001/50] | Hakola, Unto Tapani Tampereen Patenttitoimisto Oy, Hermiankatu 6 33720 Tampere / FI | Application number, filing date | 01660107.2 | 06.06.2001 | [2001/50] | Priority number, date | FI20000000234U | 06.06.2000 Original published format: FI 20000234 U | [2001/50] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1161897 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1161897 | Date: | 10.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A47B37/00, A47F9/00 | [2001/50] | CPC: |
A47F9/00 (EP);
F24F8/97 (EP);
F24F9/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/50] | Extension states | LT | 31.05.2002 | LV | 31.05.2002 | RO | 31.05.2002 | SI | 31.05.2002 | Title | German: | Kassentisch für Gaststätte und ein Verfahren für seine Verwendung | [2001/50] | English: | Restaurant service counter and a method for using same | [2001/50] | French: | Guichet pour restaurants et un procédé pour son utilisation | [2001/50] | Examination procedure | 31.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/31] | 24.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.03.2004 | BE | 10.03.2004 | CH | 10.03.2004 | CY | 10.03.2004 | FR | 10.03.2004 | IT | 10.03.2004 | LI | 10.03.2004 | NL | 10.03.2004 | TR | 10.03.2004 | LU | 06.06.2004 | IE | 08.06.2004 | DK | 10.06.2004 | GR | 10.06.2004 | SE | 10.06.2004 | DE | 12.06.2004 | ES | 21.06.2004 | MC | 30.06.2004 | PT | 10.08.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/36] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
BE | 10.03.2004 | ||
CH | 10.03.2004 | ||
CY | 10.03.2004 | ||
FR | 10.03.2004 | ||
IT | 10.03.2004 | ||
LI | 10.03.2004 | ||
NL | 10.03.2004 | ||
TR | 10.03.2004 | ||
LU | 06.06.2004 | ||
IE | 08.06.2004 | ||
DK | 10.06.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
DE | 12.06.2004 | ||
ES | 21.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2007/09] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
BE | 10.03.2004 | ||
CH | 10.03.2004 | ||
CY | 10.03.2004 | ||
FR | 10.03.2004 | ||
LI | 10.03.2004 | ||
NL | 10.03.2004 | ||
TR | 10.03.2004 | ||
LU | 06.06.2004 | ||
IE | 08.06.2004 | ||
DK | 10.06.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
DE | 12.06.2004 | ||
ES | 21.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
BE | 10.03.2004 | ||
CH | 10.03.2004 | ||
FR | 10.03.2004 | ||
LI | 10.03.2004 | ||
NL | 10.03.2004 | ||
TR | 10.03.2004 | ||
LU | 06.06.2004 | ||
IE | 08.06.2004 | ||
DK | 10.06.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
DE | 12.06.2004 | ||
ES | 21.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
BE | 10.03.2004 | ||
CH | 10.03.2004 | ||
FR | 10.03.2004 | ||
LI | 10.03.2004 | ||
NL | 10.03.2004 | ||
LU | 06.06.2004 | ||
IE | 08.06.2004 | ||
DK | 10.06.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
DE | 12.06.2004 | ||
ES | 21.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
BE | 10.03.2004 | ||
CH | 10.03.2004 | ||
LI | 10.03.2004 | ||
NL | 10.03.2004 | ||
LU | 06.06.2004 | ||
IE | 08.06.2004 | ||
DK | 10.06.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
DE | 12.06.2004 | ||
ES | 21.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
BE | 10.03.2004 | ||
CH | 10.03.2004 | ||
LI | 10.03.2004 | ||
NL | 10.03.2004 | ||
LU | 06.06.2004 | ||
DK | 10.06.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
DE | 12.06.2004 | ||
ES | 21.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
BE | 10.03.2004 | ||
CH | 10.03.2004 | ||
LI | 10.03.2004 | ||
NL | 10.03.2004 | ||
DK | 10.06.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
DE | 12.06.2004 | ||
ES | 21.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
BE | 10.03.2004 | ||
CH | 10.03.2004 | ||
LI | 10.03.2004 | ||
NL | 10.03.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
DE | 12.06.2004 | ||
ES | 21.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
BE | 10.03.2004 | ||
CH | 10.03.2004 | ||
LI | 10.03.2004 | ||
NL | 10.03.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
ES | 21.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/05] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
BE | 10.03.2004 | ||
CH | 10.03.2004 | ||
LI | 10.03.2004 | ||
NL | 10.03.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
ES | 21.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
BE | 10.03.2004 | ||
CH | 10.03.2004 | ||
LI | 10.03.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
ES | 21.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
BE | 10.03.2004 | ||
CH | 10.03.2004 | ||
LI | 10.03.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/44] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
CH | 10.03.2004 | ||
LI | 10.03.2004 | ||
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/43] | AT | 10.03.2004 | |
GR | 10.06.2004 | ||
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | GR | 10.06.2004 | |
SE | 10.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | SE | 10.06.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2572120 (DIXON FATE A) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 31 - line 42; figure 2 *; | [Y]US3893457 (VAN DER WAAIJ DIRK) [Y] 1-10 * column 3, line 59 - column 4, line 10; figures 1,3 *; | [A]WO8504240 (FOSTER LEO J, et al) [A] 1* figure 2 *; | [DY]GB2180054 (HOLWAY JOHN WALTER) [DY] 1-10 * page 2, line 86 - line 101 * * page 2, line 108 - line 112; figure 3 *; | [A]US5417433 (PHILLIPS DONALD A [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 40 - line 47; figures 1,2 * |