EP1195135 - Wrist-worn device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2006 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 16.05.2007 [2007/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Polar Electro Oy Professorintie 5 90440 Kempele / FI | [2002/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nissilä, Seppo Sääskitie 4 90550 Oulu / FI | [2002/15] | Representative(s) | Antila, Harri Jukka Tapani Kolster Oy Ab Elektroniikkatie 8 90590 Oulu / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2002/15] | Antila, Harri Jukka Tapani Kolster Oy Ab, Iso Roobertinkatu 23 00120 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 01660187.4 | 05.10.2001 | [2002/15] | Priority number, date | FI20000002209 | 06.10.2000 Original published format: FI 20002209 | [2002/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1195135 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1195135 | Date: | 22.10.2003 | [2003/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1195135 | Date: | 11.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/024 | [2002/15] | CPC: |
A61B5/681 (EP,US);
A61B5/02438 (EP,US);
A61B5/0245 (EP,US);
A61B5/282 (EP,US);
A63B2071/0663 (EP,US);
A63B2230/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/15] | Title | German: | Am Handgelenk tragbare Vorrichtung | [2002/15] | English: | Wrist-worn device | [2002/15] | French: | Dispositif porté au poignet | [2002/15] | Examination procedure | 23.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/17] | 22.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.05.2005 | BE | 11.05.2005 | CH | 11.05.2005 | FI | 11.05.2005 | LI | 11.05.2005 | NL | 11.05.2005 | TR | 11.05.2005 | DK | 11.08.2005 | GR | 11.08.2005 | SE | 11.08.2005 | ES | 22.08.2005 | CY | 05.10.2005 | IE | 05.10.2005 | PT | 19.10.2005 | LU | 31.10.2005 | MC | 31.10.2005 | [2007/20] |
Former [2007/09] | AT | 11.05.2005 | |
BE | 11.05.2005 | ||
CH | 11.05.2005 | ||
FI | 11.05.2005 | ||
LI | 11.05.2005 | ||
NL | 11.05.2005 | ||
TR | 11.05.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
ES | 22.08.2005 | ||
IE | 05.10.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
LU | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 11.05.2005 | |
BE | 11.05.2005 | ||
CH | 11.05.2005 | ||
FI | 11.05.2005 | ||
LI | 11.05.2005 | ||
NL | 11.05.2005 | ||
TR | 11.05.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
ES | 22.08.2005 | ||
IE | 05.10.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 11.05.2005 | |
BE | 11.05.2005 | ||
CH | 11.05.2005 | ||
FI | 11.05.2005 | ||
LI | 11.05.2005 | ||
NL | 11.05.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
ES | 22.08.2005 | ||
IE | 05.10.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/30] | AT | 11.05.2005 | |
BE | 11.05.2005 | ||
CH | 11.05.2005 | ||
FI | 11.05.2005 | ||
LI | 11.05.2005 | ||
NL | 11.05.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
ES | 22.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 11.05.2005 | |
BE | 11.05.2005 | ||
CH | 11.05.2005 | ||
FI | 11.05.2005 | ||
LI | 11.05.2005 | ||
NL | 11.05.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
ES | 22.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 11.05.2005 | |
BE | 11.05.2005 | ||
CH | 11.05.2005 | ||
FI | 11.05.2005 | ||
LI | 11.05.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
ES | 22.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 11.05.2005 | |
BE | 11.05.2005 | ||
FI | 11.05.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 11.05.2005 | |
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 11.08.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH04253839 ; | [A]DE2824899 (KEIPER TRAININGSYSTEME GMBH) [A] 2* page 7, line 29 - page 8, line 1; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [XY]FR2595480 (SURRIDGE ROGER [FR]) [X] 1-4,7 * page 3, line 17 - page 4, line 9 * * page 4, line 30 - page 5, line 20 * * page 6, line 17 - page 7, line 24; figures 1-4 * [Y] 2-4,7; | [A]WO9000366 (MCCARTHY JOHN PATRICK [AU]) [A] 2 * page 6, line 14 - page 8, line 19; figure 1 *; | [X]US5840039 (HEIKKILAE ILKKA [FI]) [X] 1,5 * column 3, line 39 - line 62; figures 3,5 *; | [Y]US5876346 (CORSO ALBERT MARIO [US]) [Y] 8-12 * column 4, line 58 - column 5, line 66; figures 1,2 *; | [XY]EP1020161 (POLAR ELECTRO OY [FI]) [X] 1,6 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0010] , [0012] , [0020]; figures 1,3,4 * [Y] 2-4,7-12 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930125), vol. 017, no. 037, Database accession no. (C - 1019), & JP04253839 A 19920909 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 2 * abstract * |