EP1120444 - Ternary pigment compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 22.08.2007 [2007/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ciba Specialty Chemicals Holding Inc. Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | [2001/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lenz, Roman Tiergartenstrasse 40 4410 Liestal / CH | 02 /
Wallquist, Olof Spechtstrasse 34 4106 Therwil / CH | 03 /
Schlöder, Ingo Chemin des Glycines 6 1753 Matran / CH | [2001/31] | Application number, filing date | 01810049.5 | 18.01.2001 | [2001/31] | Priority number, date | CH2000155 | 27.01.2000 Original published format: CH 2000155 | [2001/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1120444 | Date: | 01.08.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1120444 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | [2003/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1120444 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C09B67/22, C09B67/48 | [2001/31] | CPC: |
C09B67/0039 (EP,US);
C09B5/00 (KR);
C09B57/004 (EP,US);
C09B67/003 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2004/24] |
Former [2001/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Ternäre Pigment-Zusammensetzungen | [2001/31] | English: | Ternary pigment compositions | [2001/31] | French: | Compositions ternaires de pigments | [2001/31] | Examination procedure | 03.01.2002 | Examination requested [2004/18] | 06.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 18.01.2005 | [2007/34] | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US4579949 (ROCHAT ALAIN C [CH], et al) [DA] 1-10* column 7, line 60 - line 64; example 44; claim 1 *; | [DA]US4783540 (BAEBLER FRIDOLIN [CH]) [DA] 1-10 * column 6, line 9 - line 11; example 2 *; | [A]EP0794235 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [A] 1-10 * page 7, line 46 - line 47; example 6; claims 1,7,9 * |