EP1244083 - Method for collecting consumption data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.11.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.2004 [2004/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Metrix Systems AG Lerchensangstrasse 13 8552 Felben-Wellhausen / CH | [2002/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Augsburger, Urs Hauptstrasse 41 8566 Neuvilen / CH | [2002/39] | Representative(s) | Steiner, Martin c/o AMMANN PATENTANWÄLTE AG BERN Schwarztorstrasse 31 3001 Bern / CH | [2002/39] | Application number, filing date | 01810287.1 | 21.03.2001 | [2002/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1244083 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G08C17/02 | [2002/39] | CPC: |
G08C17/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2003/24] |
Former [2002/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Erfassen von Verbrauchsdaten | [2002/39] | English: | Method for collecting consumption data | [2002/39] | French: | Procédé de collecte de données de consommation | [2002/39] | Examination procedure | 26.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/01] | 23.07.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.05.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 06.05.2003 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4455453 (PARASEKVAKOS THEODOROS G [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 3, line 27 - column 5, line 12 * * column 5, line 52 - column 6, line 52 * [Y] 3,6-8,10,11; | [Y]EP0629098 (LOGICA UK LTD [GB]) [Y] 3,6-8,10,11 * column 3, line 35 - column 6, line 5 * * column 6, line 50 - column 7, line 3 * * column 9, line 39 - column 10, line 18 * * column 12, line 53 - column 13, line 49 *; | [A]WO9965169 (ABB POWER T & D CO [US]) [A] 1,2 * page 6, line 25 - page 7, line 22 * * page 12, line 3 - page 14, line 14 * |