EP1244281 - Method and device for providing a user with personalizable voice services in a voice telecommunications network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/39] | Method and device for providing a user with personal voice services in a voice telecommunications network | ||
[2005/48] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Swisscom AG Alte Tiefenaustrasse 6 3050 Bern / CH | [2002/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Kommer, M. Robert 45, Route du Coteau 1752 Villars-sur-Glâne / CH | [2002/39] | Representative(s) | P&TS SA (AG, Ltd.) Avenue J.-J. Rousseau 4 P.O. Box 2848 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [N/P] | P&TS Patents & Technology Surveys SA Case Postale 2848 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | ||
Former [2004/51] | P&TS Patents & Technology Surveys SA Terreaux 7 P.O.Box 2848 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | ||
Former [2002/39] | Saam, Christophe Patents & Technology Surveys SA Faubourg du Lac 2 Case Postale 1448 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | Application number, filing date | 01810292.1 | 21.03.2001 | [2002/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1244281 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1244281 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/42, H04Q3/00 | [2002/39] | CPC: |
H04M3/527 (EP);
H04Q3/0016 (EP);
H04M2201/40 (EP);
H04M2201/60 (EP);
H04M7/126 (EP);
H04M7/1295 (EP);
H04Q1/45 (EP);
H04Q2213/13093 (EP);
H04Q2213/13098 (EP);
H04Q2213/13109 (EP);
H04Q2213/13349 (EP);
H04Q2213/13376 (EP);
H04Q2213/13378 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/39] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung, um einem Benutzer personalisierbare Sprachdienste in einem Sprachtelekommunikationsnetzwerk anzubieten | [2005/48] | English: | Method and device for providing a user with personalizable voice services in a voice telecommunications network | [2005/48] | French: | Méthode et dispositif permettant d'offrir un ensemble de services vocaux personnalisables à un utilisateur dans un réseau de télécommunication vocal | [2002/39] |
Former [2002/39] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bereitstellung von personalisierten Sprachdiensten in einem sprachorientirten Telekommunikationsnetzwerk | ||
Former [2002/39] | Method and device for providing a user with personal voice services in a voice telecommunications network | Examination procedure | 27.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/04] | 18.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.11.2005 | CY | 30.11.2005 | FI | 30.11.2005 | GB | 30.11.2005 | IE | 30.11.2005 | IT | 30.11.2005 | NL | 30.11.2005 | TR | 30.11.2005 | DK | 28.02.2006 | GR | 28.02.2006 | SE | 28.02.2006 | DE | 01.03.2006 | ES | 13.03.2006 | BE | 31.03.2006 | FR | 31.03.2006 | LU | 31.03.2006 | MC | 31.03.2006 | PT | 02.05.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
GB | 30.11.2005 | ||
IE | 30.11.2005 | ||
IT | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
TR | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
DE | 01.03.2006 | ||
ES | 13.03.2006 | ||
BE | 31.03.2006 | ||
FR | 31.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
GB | 30.11.2005 | ||
IE | 30.11.2005 | ||
IT | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
DE | 01.03.2006 | ||
ES | 13.03.2006 | ||
BE | 31.03.2006 | ||
FR | 31.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/36] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
GB | 30.11.2005 | ||
IE | 30.11.2005 | ||
IT | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
DE | 01.03.2006 | ||
ES | 13.03.2006 | ||
BE | 31.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
GB | 30.11.2005 | ||
IE | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
DE | 01.03.2006 | ||
ES | 13.03.2006 | ||
BE | 31.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
GB | 30.11.2005 | ||
IE | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
DE | 01.03.2006 | ||
ES | 13.03.2006 | ||
LU | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
IE | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
DE | 01.03.2006 | ||
ES | 13.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
IE | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
IE | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/46] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 30.11.2005 | |
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 30.11.2005 | |
NL | 30.11.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US5652789 (MINER RICHARD A [US], et al) [X] 1-5,9,13-15,17,19,20,24,29,30,32,33 * abstract * * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 48 * * column 3, line 24 - line 26 * * column 5, line 29 - column 6, line 60 * * column 7, line 15 - column 10, line 65 * * column 14, line 20 - column 16, line 30 * * column 21, line 51 - line 55 * * column 22, line 27 - line 60 * * column 27, line 15 - line 21 * * column 37, line 25 - line 32 * * column 38, line 51 - line 65 * * column 40, line 55 - line 64 * * column 42, line 43 - column 43, line 6 * * column 45, line 46 - column 46, line 2 * [A] 11,23,26,28,31,34 [Y] 6-8,10,12,16,18,21,22,25,27; | [Y]US5771273 (MCALLISTER ALEXANDER I [US], et al) [Y] 7,10,18,25,27 * abstract * * column 3, line 24 - line 31 * * column 8, line 34 - line 37 * * column 8, line 59 - line 64 * * column 9, line 17 - line 24 * * column 10, line 5 - line 16 *; | [XY]EP0942574 (KONINKL KPN NV [NL]) [X] 35-37 * abstract * * column 1, line 14 - column 2, line 42 * * column 3, line 35 - line 42 * * column 3, line 57 - column 4, line 3 * * column 4, line 16 - column 5, line 15 * * column 6, line 1 - line 5 *[Y] 6,8,21,22; | [XY]US6021181 (MINER RICHARD A [US], et al) [X] 37-39 * abstract * * column 1, line 17 - line 63 * * column 4, line 4 - line 34 * * column 12, line 35 - line 43 * [Y] 12,16 |