EP1249548 - Wall element of a sliding wall [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 08.11.2017 [2017/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states H & T Raumdesign AG Rohrerstrasse 20 5001 Aarau / CH | [2002/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zulauf, Thomas Unterdorf 3 5105 Auenstein / CH | [2002/42] | Representative(s) | Frei Patent Attorneys Frei Patentanwaltsbüro AG Hagenholzstrasse 85 8050 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2016/14] | Frei Patent Attorneys Frei Patentanwaltsbüro AG Postfach 1771 8032 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2002/42] | Frei, Alexandra Sarah Frei Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach 768 8029 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 01810370.5 | 12.04.2001 | [2002/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1249548 | Date: | 16.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1249548 | Date: | 06.04.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | E06B3/02, E04B2/82 | [2015/47] | CPC: |
E06B3/025 (EP);
E04B2/827 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/42] | E04B2/82 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, LI [2016/14] |
Former [2003/28] | AT, CH, DE, LI | ||
Former [2002/42] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Wandelement einer Schiebewand | [2002/42] | English: | Wall element of a sliding wall | [2002/42] | French: | Elément de paroi d'une paroi coulissante | [2002/42] | Examination procedure | 08.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/19] | 17.04.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.08.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 06.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.11.2008 | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 17.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 15.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 18.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 18.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 09.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.05.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.05.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.04.2016 | [2017/45] | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0629752 (ROSCONI AG [CH]) [X] 1-3,6,7,11-13 * column W * [Y] 5,9; | [Y]DE19634391 (DORMA GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 5,9 * column W *; | [X]DE19829783 (GEZE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,11-13 * column W *; | [A]US3072975 (BURMEISTER ALBERT J) [A] 1-3,7 * column W * | by applicant | CH684543 |