EP1172874 - High temperature fuel cells installation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.05.2007 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.06.2007 [2007/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sulzer Hexis AG Zürcherstrasse 48 8400 Winterthur / CH | [2002/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ströhle, Werner Walgaustrasse 23 6845 Klaus / AT | 02 /
Nani, Marco Bahnhofstrasse 37 9475 Sevelen / CH | 03 /
Gamper, Thomas Dorfstrasse 59 8219 Trasadingen / CH | [2002/03] | Representative(s) | Sulzer Management AG Patentabteilung / 0067 Zürcherstrasse 14 8401 Winterthur / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2002/03] | Sulzer Management AG KS/Patente/0007 Zürcherstrasse 12 8401 Winterthur / CH | Application number, filing date | 01810568.4 | 13.06.2001 | [2002/03] | Priority number, date | EP20000810611 | 12.07.2000 Original published format: EP 00810611 | [2002/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1172874 | Date: | 16.01.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1172874 | Date: | 23.01.2002 | [2002/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/04 | [2002/03] | CPC: |
H01M8/04007 (EP);
H01M8/04 (EP);
H01M2008/1293 (EP);
H01M2250/405 (EP);
H01M8/04014 (EP);
Y02B90/10 (EP);
Y02E60/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/03] | Title | German: | Anlage mit Hochtemperatur-Brennstoffzellen | [2002/03] | English: | High temperature fuel cells installation | [2002/03] | French: | Installation de piles à combustible fonctionnant à haute température | [2002/03] | Examination procedure | 27.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/35] | 11.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/25] | 06.02.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2006 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0926755 (SULZER HEXIS AG [CH]) [X] 1,2,4-7,10 * column 5, line 6 - column 54; figure 5; claims 9,11,12 * [Y] 8,9; | [XY]EP0814526 (SULZER HEXIS AG [CH]) [X] 1,2,4-7 * column 4, line 55 - column 5, line 16; figure 4 * [Y] 8,9; | [Y]JPH01126137 ; | [X]EP0977295 (SULZER HEXIS AG [CH]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 43 - line 58; figure 1 * * column 4, line 27 - line 35; claims 2,5 *; | [X]WO9804011 (ZTEK CORP [US]) [X] 1,5 * claims 1,7,14,15,24,47,52,54 * * page 7, line 8 - line 21; figure 3 *; | [X]EP0818840 (SULZER HEXIS AG [CH]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 15; figure 2 * * column 2, line 4 - line 7 *; | [X]WO9418712 (BOSSEL ULF DR [CH]) [X] 1,4-7,10 * page 3, paragraph 2 * * page 7, line 35 - page 8, paragraph 1; figure 1 * * page 10, paragraph 2 - page 11, paragraph 1; figure 5 * * page 19, paragraph 2 *; | [X]JPH08148166 ; | [A]DE19948215 (VAILLANT JOH GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 13 - line 18; figure 1 * * column 2, line 9 - line 16 *; | [A]US4683177 (KINOSHITA TOMOHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 46 - line 58; figure 2 *; | [A]EP0568822 (OSAKA GAS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * column 6, line 33 - line 38; figure 1 * * column 10, line 54 - column 11, line 28 * * column 9, line 36 - line 47 * | [XY] - DRENCKHAHN W ET AL, "TECHNISCHE UND WIRTSCHAFTLICHE ASPEKTE DES BRENNSTOFFZELLENEINSATZES IN KRAFT-WAERME-KOPPLUNGSANLAGEN", VGB KRAFTWERKSTECHNIK, VGB KRAFTWERKSTECHNIK GMBH. ESSEN, DE, (19910401), vol. 71, no. 4, ISSN 0372-5715, pages 332 - 335, XP000217446 [X] 1,8,9 * page 333, column 2, paragraph L - column 3, paragraph 1; figure 4 * [Y] 8,9 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890818), vol. 013, no. 374, Database accession no. (E - 808), & JP01126137 A 19890518 (OSAKA GAS CO LTD) [Y] 8,9 * abstract * | [Y] - KUNIO SHIBATA, "THE TOKYO ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY (TEPCO) FUEL CELL EVALUATION PROGRAM", JOURNAL OF POWER SOURCES,CH,ELSEVIER SEQUOIA S.A. LAUSANNE, (1992), vol. 37, no. 1 / 02, ISSN 0378-7753, pages 81 - 99, XP000258149 [Y] 8,9 * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-7753(92)80066-K | [X] - LUNDBERG W L, "COGENERATION APPLICATIONS OF A NATURAL GAS-FUELED SOFC GENERATOR", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SYMPOSIUM ON FUEL CELLS,US,PENNINGTON, ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY, (19891106), vol. -, pages 118 - 129, XP002047354 [X] 1,5 * figures 4,7 * | [PX] - R. DIETHELM ET AL, "Status of the Sulzer Hexis product development", PROCEEDINGS OF INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE. FUEL CELL 2000, LUCERN, SWITZERLAND, 10-14 JULY 2000, OBERROHRDORF, SWITZERLAND, pages 203 - 211, XP001034720 [PX] 1,5,6 * page 203, paragraph L * * abstract * * page 205, line 5 - line 8 * * page 208, paragraph L * | [X] - T. YOSHIDA ET AL, "CONCEPTUAL DESIGN OF 200 kW TOWN GAS REFORMED MOLTEN CARBONATE FUEL CELL COGENERATION PLANT", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF HYDROGEN ENERGY, OXFORD GB, (1988), vol. 13, no. 10, pages 625 - 632, XP002184140 [X] 1,5,6,10 * page 625, column R, paragraph L - page 626, column L, paragraph 1; figure 3 * * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0360-3199(88)90011-0 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961031), vol. 1996, no. 10, & JP08148166 A 19960607 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1,4,5 * abstract * | [A] - KRUMPELT M ET AL, "SYSTEMS ANALYSIS FOR HIGH-TEMPERATURE FUEL CELLS", EXTENDED ABSTRACTS,US,ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY. PRINCETON, NEW JERSEY, (19871018), vol. 87-2, ISSN 0160-4619, pages 261 - 262, XP000115057 [A] 1 * figure 3 * |