EP1236841 - Flat roof and inspection device for flat roof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.04.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.05.2004 [2004/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nadig, Urs Ganischastrasse 8890 Flums / CH | [2002/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/36] | Representative(s) | Groner, Manfred, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2002/36] | Groner, Manfred, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG, Patentanwälte, Postfach 6940 8023 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 01810615.3 | 25.06.2001 | [2002/36] | Priority number, date | CH20010000384 | 01.03.2001 Original published format: CH 3842001 | [2002/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1236841 | Date: | 04.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1236841 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | [2003/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | E04D13/00 | [2002/36] | CPC: |
E04D13/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2003/42] |
Former [2002/36] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Flachdach und Inspektions-vorrichtung für ein Flachdach | [2002/36] | English: | Flat roof and inspection device for flat roof | [2002/36] | French: | Toit plat et dispositif d'inspection pour toit plat | [2002/36] | Examination procedure | 30.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/21] | 11.12.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/21] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 05.09.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.09.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 05.09.2003 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3600374 (NEUMANN GERD, et al) [Y] 1-6,8,9 * column 7, line 38 - line 48; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5335536 (RUNNEVIK LARS [SE]) [A] 1,2,9 * column 4, line 42 - line 50; figures 2-5 *; | [A]DE3804091 (TAURUS GUMIIPARI VALLALAT [HU]) [A] 1,2,9 * column 5, paragraph 3; figure 6 *; | [A]US5862637 (BRUCE RYAN W [US]) [A] 7 * figures 3-5 * | [YA] - VAN DEN HOUT, "INSPECTIEPIJPEN, CONTROLE OP WATER IN DAKCONSTRUCTIES", BOUWWERELD, (20000828), vol. 15, pages 32 - 33, XP000963198 [Y] 1-6,8,9 * the whole document * [A] 7 |