EP1285716 - Machining by a generating method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.06.2004 [2004/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TORNOS S.A. 111, rue Industrielle 2740 Moutier / CH | [2003/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Paroz, Cedric Bas de la Sauce 64 2732 Saicourt / CH | [2003/09] | Representative(s) | BOVARD AG Patent- und Markenanwälte Optingenstrasse 16 3013 Bern / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2003/09] | BOVARD AG - Patentanwälte Optingenstrasse 16 3000 Bern 25 / CH | Application number, filing date | 01810819.1 | 22.08.2001 | [2003/09] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1285716 | Date: | 26.02.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B23F5/20 | [2003/09] | CPC: |
B23F5/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2003/46] |
Former [2003/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Abwälzbearbeitung | [2003/09] | English: | Machining by a generating method | [2003/09] | French: | Taillage par génération | [2003/09] | Examination procedure | 23.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/25] | 14.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/25] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 22.10.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.10.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.10.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 22.10.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 22.10.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.10.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 22.10.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 22.10.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 22.10.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 22.10.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 22.10.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 22.10.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.10.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.10.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 22.10.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 22.10.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 22.10.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.10.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.10.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 22.10.2003 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH11309622 ; | [Y]US4750848 (ADLER HAROLD [US]) [Y] 2,3 * column 2, line 65 - column 4, line 40; figures 2,3 *; | [Y]DE3832612 (HOLZWARTH WALTER DIPL ING [DE], et al) [Y] 6,7 * abstract *; | [X] - KUP B ET AL, "DIGITALE ANTRIEBE ZUM GENAUEN VERZAHNEN", WERKSTATT UND BETRIEB, CARL HANSER VERLAG. MUNCHEN, DE, (19940601), vol. 127, no. 6, ISSN 0043-2792, pages 448 - 449, XP000456288 [X] 1,9,11 * page 448, line 1 - line 25; figure 1 * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000229), vol. 2000, no. 02, & JP11309622 A 19991109 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1,4,9,11 * abstract * [Y] 2,3,5-8,10 | [Y] - LANGE J, "INNOVATIVE CNC GEAR SHAPING", GEAR TECHNOLOGY, RANDALL PUBLISHING CO. ELK GROVE, ILLINOIS, US, (1994), vol. 11, no. 1, ISSN 0743-6858, pages 16 - 29, XP000425630 [Y] 5,8,10 * the whole document * | [A] - PAPAIONNOU S G, "MANUFACTURE OF HIGH PRECISION SPUR GEARS WITH END MILLING CUTTERS", TRANSACTIONS OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF MECHANICAL ENGINEERS, SERIES B: JOURNAL OF ENGINEERING FOR INDUSTRY, ASME. NEW YORK, US, (19881101), vol. 110, no. 4, ISSN 0022-0817, pages 359 - 366, XP000024314 [A] 2 * the whole document * |