EP1310766 - Navigation computer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.06.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TB-Electronics GmbH. Nöllenstrasse 15a 9443 Widnau / CH | [2003/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Böhme, Thomas Unterbüntelistrasse 71 9443 Widnau / CH | [2003/20] | Representative(s) | Hepp, Dieter, et al Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2003/20] | Hepp, Dieter, et al Hepp, Wenger & Ryffel AG, Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | Application number, filing date | 01811089.0 | 13.11.2001 | [2003/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1310766 | Date: | 14.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/20, G06F19/00, G09F1/10 | [2003/20] | CPC: |
G01C21/20 (EP);
G09F1/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/20] | Title | German: | Navigationscomputer | [2003/20] | English: | Navigation computer | [2003/20] | French: | Ordinateur de navigation | [2003/20] | Examination procedure | 28.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/35] | 12.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/29] | 28.02.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2006 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]FR2637682 (ALLOUARD GUY [FR]) [X] 1,6 * page 2, line 3 - page 3, line 10; claims 1-7 * [Y] 2-4,7-13; | [Y]US5340061 (VAQUIER MARIANNICK [FR], et al) [Y] 2-4,7-13 * column 2, line 4 - column 3, line 60 * * column 4, line 11 - column 6, line 41; figures 1-12; claims 1-9 *; | [A]US4220994 (HENDRICKSON ALVIN E [US]) [A] 1-13 * Das ganze Dokument *; | [A]US6072473 (MULLER JEAN [FR], et al) [A] 1-13 * Das ganze Dokument * |