EP1317977 - Method of making wire grids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.08.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.09.2004 [2004/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states H.A. SCHLATTER AG Brandstrasse 24 8952 Schlieren / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2003/24] | For all designated states H.A. SCHLATTER AG Brandstrasse 24 CH-8952 Schlieren Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schauhoff, Carsten Im Tiergarten 41 8055 Zürich / CH | 02 /
Hollenweger, Max Rietstrasse 34 8103 Unterengstringen / CH | [2003/24] | Representative(s) | Roshardt, Werner Alfred Keller & Partner Patentanwälte AG Eigerstrasse 2 Postfach 3000 Bern 14 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2003/24] | Roshardt, Werner Alfred, Dipl.-Phys. Keller & Partner Patentanwälte AG Schmiedenplatz 5 Postfach 3000 Bern 7 / CH | Application number, filing date | 01811193.0 | 07.12.2001 | [2003/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1317977 | Date: | 11.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B21F23/00, B21F27/10 | [2003/24] | CPC: |
B21F27/10 (EP);
B21F23/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/10] |
Former [2003/24] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen von Drahtgittern | [2003/24] | English: | Method of making wire grids | [2003/24] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de treillis de fil | [2003/24] | Examination procedure | 12.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/40] | 06.04.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/40] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.01.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.01.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 19.01.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]AT373798B (HUFNAGL & CO RISTA DRAHT [AT]) [X] 1-6,8-10,12,13 * page 4, line 46 - page 5, line 23; figure - *; | [A]US5125436 (GRABUSCHNIG JOSEF [AT], et al) [A] 1,5,11 * column 4, line 16 - line 23; figure -; claim 1 *; | [A]GB1104189 (BAUSTAHLGEWEBE GMBH) [A] 1,5 * figure -; claim 1 * |