EP1130208 - A hinge for metal door and window frames [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.01.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.02.2009 [2009/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GSG INTERNATIONAL S.p.A. Via Tubertini, 1 40054 Budrio (Bologna) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/36] | For all designated states GSG International S.p.A. Via Tubertini, 1 40054 Budrio (Bologna) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lambertini, Marco Via Martiri di Pizzocalvo, 89 40068 San Lazzaro di Savena (Bologna) / IT | [2001/36] | Representative(s) | Lanzoni, Luciano Bugnion S.p.A. Via di Corticella, 87 40128 Bologna / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/36] | Lanzoni, Luciano c/o BUGNION S.p.A. Via Goito, 18 40126 Bologna / IT | Application number, filing date | 01830125.9 | 22.02.2001 | [2001/36] | Priority number, date | IT2000BO00078 | 22.02.2000 Original published format: IT BO000078 | [2001/36] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1130208 | Date: | 05.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1130208 | Date: | 10.08.2005 | [2005/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | E05D5/02 | [2001/36] | CPC: |
E05D5/0238 (EP);
E05Y2900/132 (EP);
E05Y2900/148 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/36] | Title | German: | Scharnier für metallische Tür- und Fensterrahmen | [2001/36] | English: | A hinge for metal door and window frames | [2001/36] | French: | Charnière pour portes et fenêtres à châssis métallique | [2001/36] | Examination procedure | 06.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/44] | 30.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/09] | 08.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2008 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB531347 (ARTHUR LESLIE WIGGIN) [X] 1,5 * page 1, line 53 - line 57 * * page 2, line 16 - line 45 * * figure - * [Y] 2-4,6-9; | [Y]EP0659967 (ERRETI SRL [IT]) [Y] 2-4,6-9 * abstract * * column 3, line 51 - line 53 * * figure - * |