EP1260630 - Improvement in a collapsible support frame, particularly for ironing-boards [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 13.08.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Axana 2000 s.r.l. Via Dante Alighieri, 104 36060 Romano d'Ezzelino (VI) / IT | [2002/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Manfiotto, Arcangelo Via Castellana, 12/D 36060 Romano D'Ezzelino (VI) / IT | [2002/48] | Representative(s) | Iannone, Carlo Luigi, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Roma S.p.A. Via Piemonte 26 00187 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/48] | Iannone, Carlo Luigi, et al Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Roma S.p.A. Via Piemonte, 26 00187 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 01830324.8 | 21.05.2001 | [2002/48] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1260630 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | D06F81/04 | [2002/48] | CPC: |
D06F81/04 (EP,US);
Y10S38/03 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/48] | Extension states | SI | 28.03.2003 | Title | German: | Verbessertes zusammenklappbares Gestell, insbesondere für eine Bügeltischplatte | [2002/48] | English: | Improvement in a collapsible support frame, particularly for ironing-boards | [2002/48] | French: | Amélioration d'un chassis de support pliant, en particulier pour une planche de repassage | [2002/48] | Examination procedure | 28.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/22] | 24.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/37] | 13.05.2010 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]ITVR960033U (AXANA SRL [IT]); | [A]EP1029969 (O M P DI PECORARI MARTINO COST [IT]); | [A]FR2461773 (LODZKIE ZAKLADY PROTOTYPOW MAS [PL]) |