EP1270133 - Sliding contact rolling head for an electric resistance welder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cevolani S.p.A Via Giuseppe di Vittorio 21/B 40013 Castel Maggiore (BO) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/28] | For all designated states Cevolani S.p.A Via Colunga, 18 40068 San Lazzaro di Savena-Bologna / IT | ||
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states Pelliconi International Machinery S.p.A. Via Donato Creti, 16 40128 Bologna / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sgrignuoli, Vittorio Via Carlo Goldoni, 15 40127 Bologna / IT | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | Lanzoni, Luciano Bugnion S.p.A. Via di Corticella, 87 40128 Bologna / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | Lanzoni, Luciano c/o BUGNION S.p.A. Via Goito, 18 40126 Bologna / IT | Application number, filing date | 01830410.5 | 20.06.2001 | [2003/01] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1270133 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1270133 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B23K11/30, B23K11/36 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
B23K11/3036 (EP,US);
B23K11/3045 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/01] | Title | German: | Schleifkontakt-Rollenkopf für eine elektrische Widerstandsschweissmaschine | [2003/01] | English: | Sliding contact rolling head for an electric resistance welder | [2003/01] | French: | Tête à rouleau à contact glissant pour une machine de soudage à résistance électrique | [2003/01] | Examination procedure | 29.05.2002 | Examination requested [2003/01] | 24.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 14.09.2005 | CY | 14.09.2005 | FI | 14.09.2005 | NL | 14.09.2005 | TR | 14.09.2005 | DK | 14.12.2005 | GR | 14.12.2005 | SE | 14.12.2005 | PT | 14.02.2006 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/02] | BE | 14.09.2005 | |
CY | 14.09.2005 | ||
FI | 14.09.2005 | ||
NL | 14.09.2005 | ||
DK | 14.12.2005 | ||
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.12.2005 | ||
PT | 14.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/35] | BE | 14.09.2005 | |
FI | 14.09.2005 | ||
NL | 14.09.2005 | ||
DK | 14.12.2005 | ||
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.12.2005 | ||
PT | 14.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | BE | 14.09.2005 | |
FI | 14.09.2005 | ||
NL | 14.09.2005 | ||
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.12.2005 | ||
PT | 14.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/22] | FI | 14.09.2005 | |
NL | 14.09.2005 | ||
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/15] | FI | 14.09.2005 | |
GR | 14.12.2005 | ||
SE | 14.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 14.09.2005 | |
SE | 14.12.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH1029074 ; | [X]US1778628 (ECKMAN MERIL L) [X] 1-3,5,7,9,11-17 * page 4, line 18 - line 61; figures 4-6 * * page 4, line 95 - line 123 *; | [A]US3234495 (MARTINEZ MARTINEZ YSIDORE) [A] 1-19 * figures 1,3-9 *; | [A]GB1069687 (TAYLOR WINFIELD CORP) [A] 1-19* figures 1,3-5 *; | [A]US3609278 (CARY JOHN T) [A] 1-19 * abstract *; | [A]US4188523 (HOMMA JUN-ICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-19 * abstract *; | [XD]EP0459091 (ELPATRONIC AG [CH]) [XD] 1,5,7,9,11,12,14-17 * column 4, line 26 - column 5, line 37; figures 1,4 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980430), vol. 1998, no. 06, & JP10029074 A 19980203 (NOK CORP) [X] 1,3,5,7-9,11-17 * abstract * |